Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Jay C Zainey
Referred: Michael North
Case #: 2:25-cv-00329
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 3:54 AM CDT
Defendant
New Orleans City
Represented By
Sherri L. Hutton
City Of New Orleans
contact info
Corwin St. Raymond
City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Donesia D. Turner
City Of New Orleans
contact info
Sean Michael Markey
City Of New Orleans
contact info
Plaintiff
Airbnb, Inc.
Represented By
Chloe Goodwin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Madeline Melissa Freese
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Alexander A. Berengaut
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Mark Aaron Cunningham
Jones Walker (new Orleans)
contact info
Paul D. Clement
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bret Bodin
1133 Governor Nicholls Street
New Orleans, LA 70116
Represented By
Chloe Goodwin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Madeline Melissa Freese
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Alexander A. Berengaut
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Mark Aaron Cunningham
Jones Walker (new Orleans)
contact info
Paul D. Clement
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mid-City Mike Rentals LLC
Represented By
Chloe Goodwin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Madeline Melissa Freese
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Alexander A. Berengaut
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Mark Aaron Cunningham
Jones Walker (new Orleans)
contact info
Paul D. Clement
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Darian Morgan
2431 Iberville Street
New Orleans, LA 70119
Represented By
Chloe Goodwin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Madeline Melissa Freese
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Alexander A. Berengaut
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Mark Aaron Cunningham
Jones Walker (new Orleans)
contact info
Paul D. Clement
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brad Newell
1133 Governor Nicholls Street
New Orleans, LA 70116
Represented By
Chloe Goodwin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Madeline Melissa Freese
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Alexander A. Berengaut
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Mark Aaron Cunningham
Jones Walker (new Orleans)
contact info
Paul D. Clement
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Rosas
8235 Pritchard Place
New Orleans, LA 70118
Represented By
Chloe Goodwin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Madeline Melissa Freese
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Alexander A. Berengaut
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Mark Aaron Cunningham
Jones Walker (new Orleans)
contact info
Paul D. Clement
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 24 2025
ORDER AND REASONS denying as moot 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. FURTHER ORDERED: Defendant is permitted to refile its motion in a timely manner making any changes as necessary to address the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 4/23/2025. (mmm)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
25 25 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6) Fri 05/09 11:39 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by New Orleans City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/11/2025.(mmm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission
24 24 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Fri 05/09 11:37 AM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/7/2025. (mmm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
23 23 motion File Excess Pages Tue 05/06 6:30 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by New Orleans City.(Markey, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order re Page Limit,
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading 12(b)(6) Motion,
Att: 3 Proposed Pleading Memo in Support,
Att: 4 Proposed Pleading Notice of Submission
Thursday, April 24, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Thu 04/24 9:10 AM
ORDER AND REASONS denying as moot20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. FURTHER ORDERED: Defendant is permitted to refile its motion in a timely manner making any changes as necessary to address the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 4/23/2025. (mmm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/22 6:39 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against New Orleans City filed by Airbnb, Inc., Michael Rosas, Bret Bodin, Darian Morgan, Brad Newell, Mid-City Mike Rentals LLC.(Cunningham, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
20 20 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6) Thu 04/03 1:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by New Orleans City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/30/2025.(mmm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Thu 04/03 1:29 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 4/3/2025. (mmm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
18 18 motion File Excess Pages Wed 04/02 6:14 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by New Orleans City.(Markey, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading 12(b)(6) Motion,
Att: 3 Proposed Pleading Memo In Support,
Att: 4 Notice of Submission
Friday, March 21, 2025
17 17 misc Response/Reply Fri 03/21 12:50 PM
Response/Reply by All Plaintiffs to16 Notice of Related Case(s) (Freese, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Related Case(s) Thu 03/20 2:09 PM
Notice of Related Case(s) by New Orleans City of related case(s) 19-cv-13773. (Markey, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/18 4:50 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey Michael Davidson. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/17/2025. (mmm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice PHV
Monday, March 17, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/17 1:34 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Paul D. Clement. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/13/2025. (mmm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice PHV
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/17 1:32 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alexander A. Berengaut. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/13/2025. (mmm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice PHV
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/17 1:31 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Chloe Goodwin. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/13/2025. (mmm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice PHV
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 03/17 1:20 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, as to New Orleans City answer due 4/2/2025. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/13/2025. (mmm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/13 3:02 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Paul D. Clement (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10920014) by Airbnb, Inc., Bret Bodin, Mid-City Mike Rentals LLC, Darian Morgan, Brad Newell, Michael Rosas.(Cunningham, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Consent to Electronic Filing
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/13 2:55 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alexander A. Berengaut (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10919987) by Airbnb, Inc., Bret Bodin, Mid-City Mike Rentals LLC, Darian Morgan, Brad Newell, Michael Rosas.(Cunningham, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Consent to Electronic Filing
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/13 2:51 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Chloe Goodwin (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10919950) by Airbnb, Inc., Bret Bodin, Mid-City Mike Rentals LLC, Darian Morgan, Brad Newell, Michael Rosas.(Cunningham, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Consent to Electronic Filing
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/13 2:43 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffery M. Davidson (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10919925) by Airbnb, Inc., Bret Bodin, Mid-City Mike Rentals LLC, Darian Morgan, Brad Newell, Michael Rosas.(Cunningham, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Consent to Electronic Filing
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
6 6 motion Extension of Time to Answer Wed 03/12 3:35 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint,, by New Orleans City.Attorney Sean Michael Markey added to party New Orleans City(pty:dft).(Markey, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 20, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/20 12:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; New Orleans City served on 2/19/2025, answer due 3/12/2025. (Freese, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 02/18 9:52 AM
Summons Issued as to New Orleans City. (car)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Initial Case Assignment Tue 02/18 8:21 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Fri 02/14 8:20 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Airbnb, Inc. (Cunningham, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 79 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/14 8:17 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10886647) filed by Airbnb, Inc., Michael Rosas, Bret Bodin, Darian Morgan, Brad Newell, Mid-City Mike Rentals LLC.Attorney Mark Aaron Cunningham added to party Bret Bodin(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Aaron Cunningham added to party Brad Newell(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Aaron Cunningham added to party Darian Morgan(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Aaron Cunningham added to party Michael Rosas(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Aaron Cunningham added to party Mid-City Mike Rentals LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Aaron Cunningham added to party Airbnb, Inc.(pty:pla).(Cunningham, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons City of New Orleans