Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 8:25-cr-00064
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2025
Terminated:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 2:14 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Curtis Novell Young, Jr. (1)
Terminated: 02/13/2025


Docket last updated: 02/16/2025 3:12 AM EST
Thursday, February 13, 2025
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION documents for Supervised Release received as to Curtis Novell Young, Jr from Northern District of Ohio.(CTR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet,
Att: 2 Indictment,
Att: 3 Judgment