Case Filed:Feb 13, 2025
Terminated:Apr 23, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 2:17 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Search Warrant (1)
Terminated: 04/23/2024


Docket last updated: 02/16/2025 3:16 AM EST
Monday, April 22, 2024
1 1 APPLICATION for Search Warrant issued. (Foell, S.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
3 3 Search Warrant Returned Executed on 4/23/2024. (Foell, S.)
Related: [-]