California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-70050
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2025
Terminated:Jan 17, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 15, 2025 11:30 PM PST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christiaan H Highsmith
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Julio Sanchez (1)
Terminated: 01/17/2025
Represented By
Angela Chuang
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/16/2025 12:37 AM PST
Friday, January 17, 2025
Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Julio Sanchez Initial Appearance set for 1/17/2025 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. (jaf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Interpreter Needed in case as to Julio Sanchez (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 Notice of Proceedings on Out-of-District Criminal Charges Pursuant to Rules 5(c)(2) and (3) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure as to Julio Sanchez (1). (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Sealed Document. No NEF issued; not served by CSA. (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Initial Appearance re Rule 5 as to Julio Sanchez held on 1/17/2025. Added attorney Angela Chuang for Julio Sanchez. Advised of Rights. Advised of Charges. Reading Waived Substance. Arraigned on Indictment. Pleaded not guilty. The Court directs entry of the following Order : Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, the Court advised government counsel of the government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny, and that the failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Government moves to unseal entire case - Granted by Court. Defendant advised of his rights under Vienna Convention. DPPA; Advised. Defendant ordered released by Court with conditions and is to report to the Middle District of Florida for his February 7, 2025 court date. Case to be transferred. Recording Time: 10:56am-11:19am. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings by Julio Sanchez. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release and Appearance Unsecured Bond Entered as to Julio Sanchez in the amount of $50,000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang on 1/17/2025. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Requiring Defendant to Appear in the District Where Charges are Pending and Transferring Bail as to Julio Sanchez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang on 1/17/2025. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF CRIMINAL CASE TRANSFER. Case transfer from California Northern to Middle District of Florida of a Rule 5, Rule 32, or Rule 40 Appearance as to Julio Sanchez. Your case number is: 8:24-cr-541-KKM. Public transfer documents are accessible and can be retrieved by your court via PACER. Under seal or otherwise restricted documents will be emailed directly. Please send acknowledgement of receipt, including the case number, to InterDistrictTransfer_CAND@cand.uscourts.gov If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to the national list host at InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]