Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John Antoon II
Referred: Robert M Norway
Case #: 6:25-cv-00248
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2025
Case in other court:Circuit Court in Seminole County, 2025-CA-000134
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 5:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By
Sarah McDonald
Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP
contact info
Paul Hudson Jones, II
Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP
contact info
Mediator
Kimberly Sands
Represented By
Kimberly Sands
Upchurch Watson White & Max
contact info
Plaintiff
River Run Church
Represented By
Louis Anthony Gonzalez
Vargas Gonzalez Hevia Baldwin, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/21 10:03 AM
ORDER granting 16 Joint Motion to Attend Mediation By Zoom Videoconference. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/20/2025. (EK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/15 9:53 AM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Joint Motion to Attend Mediation by Zoom videoconference with Kimberly Sands by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Jones, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Mon 04/07 11:15 AM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on April 2, 2026 @ 10:00 am before Kimberly Sands. (Jones, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
14 14 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 03/27 4:25 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 3/27/2026 Pretrial statement due by 8/21/2026 Jury Trial set for 10/1/2026 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 B before Judge John Antoon II. Conduct mediation hearing by 6/12/2026. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. See Order for other deadlines. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/27/2025. (EK)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Case Management Report Thu 03/27 2:47 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Jones, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
12 12 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/20 5:24 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re11 Order by River Run Church identifying Other Affiliate Trident Adjusting Group, Other Affiliate Christopher Tyler Jagen for River Run Church. (Gonzalez, Louis)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order Fri 03/14 10:00 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff shall file an amended disclosure statement no later than March 21, 2025. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/14/2025. (EK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Tue 02/25 5:13 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by River Run Church. (Gonzalez, Louis)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/24 9:29 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ohio Security Insurance Company.(Jones, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Thu 02/20 9:30 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Ohio Security Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Other Affiliate Peerless Insurance Company, Other Affiliate The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Ohio Casualty Corporation, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Ohio Security Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company for Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Jones, Paul) Modified on 2/20/2025 to edit docket text (MSN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
7 7 order Interested Persons Order Tue 02/18 4:51 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 7 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 2/18/2025. (KLD)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 02/18 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Louis Anthony Gonzalez on behalf of RIVER RUN CHURCH. Lead Counsel: Louis A. Gonzalez. (Gonzalez, Louis)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of appearance Tue 02/18 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah McDonald on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Company (McDonald, Sarah)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 02/18 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Paul Hudson Jones, II on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Paul Hudson Jones II. (Jones, Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 02/18 8:32 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Louis Gonzalez of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/18 8:31 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:25-cv-248-JA-RMN. (ARL)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 02/17 10:38 AM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court in Seminole County, case number 2025-CA-000134 filed in State Court on 1/22/25. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-23027095 filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company.(Jones, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Service, Summons, Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Annual Reports,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Certified Policy,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Strong Group Estimate,
Att: 5 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 6 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet