Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney H Holmes
Case #: 4:25-cv-00194
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2025
Terminated:May 02, 2025
Case in other court:St. Charles County, 2511-CC00034
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 4:37 AM CDT
Defendant
Plug Light Bulb Electrical Services
3377 Packerland Drive Suite 140
De Pere, WI 54115
Represented By
Steven M. Wallace
Goldenberg Heller PC
contact info
Plaintiff
SourceOne Solutions, LLC
6800 Keaton Corporate Pkwy
O'Fallon, MO 63368
Represented By
Bryan P. Cavanaugh
The Cavanaugh Law Firm LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
22 22 6 pgs order Order of Remand Fri 05/02 12:22 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF REMAND (See Full Order). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is GRANTED. (Doc.17 ) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of St. Charles County, Missouri pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes on 5/2/2025. (HMA)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Fri 05/02 12:25 PM
STATISTICAL ENTRY ONLY to rule17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Charles County, Missouri by Plaintiff SourceOne Solutions, LLC. See Order22 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes on 5/2/2025. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
21 21 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/28 11:21 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Charles County, Missouri filed by Defendant Plug Light Bulb Electrical Services. (Wallace, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
20 20 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Tue 04/22 8:24 AM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant must file a response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No.17 ) by April 28, 2025. Related [+] Signed by Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes on 4/21/2025. (JEB)
Related: [-] sponse to Court due by 4/28/2025.
Friday, March 21, 2025
19 19 motion Withdraw Fri 03/21 2:51 PM
MOTION to Withdraw13 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Wisconsin by Plaintiff SourceOne Solutions, LLC. (Cavanaugh, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
18 18 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 03/17 11:32 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Charles County, Missouri filed by Plaintiff SourceOne Solutions, LLC. (Cavanaugh, Bryan)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Remand to State Court Mon 03/17 11:31 AM
MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Charles County, Missouri by Plaintiff SourceOne Solutions, LLC. (Cavanaugh, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
16 16 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Wed 03/12 2:47 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendant Plug Light Bulb Electrical Services. Amendment to12 Amended Document,1 Notice of Removal Petition, Second Amended Notice of Removal .(Wallace, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Group Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
15 15 3 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Wed 03/05 1:07 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by March 12, 2025, Defendant shall file a Second Amended Notice of Removal that alleges facts establishing the citizenship of all parties to this action. The Amended Notice should take care to fully comply with the applicable removal statutes, including stating (at the time the complaint was filed and the time of removal), the membership and the citizenship of each member of each LLC entity, as well as the state where each individual member is domiciled or resides. To the extent Defendant uncovers that any member of any LLC is a corporation, Defendant should allege that member's principal place of business and state of incorporation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant does not timely and fully comply with this Order, this matter will be remanded to the Circuit Court of St. Charles County, Missouri. Dated this 5th day of March, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes on 3/5/2025. (CLH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
14 14 3 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 03/04 4:46 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re13 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Wisconsin filed by Plaintiff SourceOne Solutions, LLC. (Cavanaugh, Bryan)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Transfer Case Tue 03/04 4:45 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Wisconsin by Plaintiff SourceOne Solutions, LLC. (Cavanaugh, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
12 12 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Thu 02/27 3:19 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendant Plug Light Bulb Electrical Services. Amendment to1 Notice of Removal Petition, .(Wallace, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Group Exhibit A - St. Charles County Filings,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit of M. Timler
Thursday, February 20, 2025
11 11 3 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Thu 02/20 2:14 PM
ORDER CONCERNING JURISDICTION (See Full Order). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by February 27, 2025, Defendant shall file an Amended Notice of Removal that alleges facts establishing the citizenship of all parties to this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant does not timely and fully comply with this Order, this matter will be remanded to the Circuit Court of St. Charles County, Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes on 2/20/2025. (HMA)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Full Consent to a Magistrate Thu 02/20 8:59 AM
FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff SourceOne Solutions, LLC, Defendant Plug Light Bulb Electrical Services. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
9 9 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 02/18 5:15 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Plug Light Bulb Electrical Services. (Wallace, Steven)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 02/18 5:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Plug Light Bulb Electrical Services.(Wallace, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Matthew Tiimler
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 02/18 2:37 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plug Light Bulb Electrical Services, Matthew Timler.. (Wallace, Steven)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 02/18 2:06 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SourceOne Solutions, LLC.. (Cavanaugh, Bryan)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY Tue 02/18 1:27 PM
Petition Related [+] Received From: St. Charles County Circuit Court, filed by SourceOne Solutions, LLC.(JWD)
Related: [-] moval/Transfer
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Invoice 319010,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Invoice 319012,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Invoice 320000
4 4 notice Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Tue 02/18 12:00 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Plug Light Bulb Electrical Services Sent To: Plaintiff (Wallace, Steven)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Tue 02/18 11:56 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Plug Light Bulb Electrical Services. (Wallace, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Tue 02/18 11:53 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL Original Filing Form by Defendant Plug Light Bulb Electrical Services. (Wallace, Steven)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Notification Tue 02/18 1:31 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney H. Holmes. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Petition Mon 02/17 9:01 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Charles County Circuit Court, case number 2511-CC00034, with receipt number AMOEDC-11092262, in the amount of $405 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Plug Light Bulb Electrical Services.(Wallace, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Group Exhibit A