New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Nina R Morrison
Case #: 1:25-cv-00910
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2025
Terminated:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 5:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Acting Director Andrew J. Davidson
Represented By
Vincent Lipari
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Secretary Kristi Noem
Represented By
Vincent Lipari
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Director Debra A. Rogers
Represented By
Vincent Lipari
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Director Kirt Thompson
Represented By
Vincent Lipari
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Attorney's Office
Represented By
Vincent Lipari
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
5900 Capital Gateway Drive Mail Stop 2120
Camp Springs, MD 20588
Represented By
Vincent Lipari
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Yongzheng Zhang
Represented By
Aleksander B Milch
The Kasen And Liu Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
order Order Dismissing Case Wed 03/19 11:18 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The8 stipulation of dismissal is so ordered. Ordered by Judge Nina R. Morrison on 3/19/2025. (AH)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/17 12:18 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Andrew J. Davidson, Kristi Noem, Debra A. Rogers, Kirt Thompson, U.S. Attorney's Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) (Lipari, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Wed 03/05 9:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yongzheng Zhang. Andrew J. Davidson served on 3/4/2025, answer due 5/5/2025; Kristi Noem served on 3/4/2025, answer due 5/5/2025; Debra A. Rogers served on 3/4/2025, answer due 5/5/2025; Kirt Thompson served on 3/4/2025, answer due 5/5/2025; U.S. Attorney's Office served on 3/4/2025, answer due 5/5/2025; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) served on 3/4/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/04 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Lipari on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Lipari, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 02/21 12:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Andrew J. Davidson, Kristi Noem, Debra A. Rogers, Kirt Thompson, U.S. Attorney's Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (SG)
Related: [-]
order Order to Show Cause (Federal) Fri 02/21 10:22 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and Electronic Service Upon the U.S. Attorneys Office: (1) The United States Attorney, as attorney for respondent, shall show cause before this Court why a writ of mandamus should not be issued by filing a return to the petition; (2) Within sixty (60) days of this Order, the United States Attorney shall serve a copy of their return on the petitioner herein and shall file the original thereof, with proof of service, with the Clerk of the Court; and (3) Petitioner shall file a reply, if any, with the Clerk of the Court within thirty (30) days of receiving the return and serve a copy on the respondents. Ordered by Judge Nina R. Morrison on 2/21/2025. (AH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/20 11:16 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by Yongzheng Zhang (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 02/19 10:49 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/19 10:41 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Nina R. Morrison. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Wed 02/19 10:46 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: No summons provided, please submit summons. The event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 02/18 7:08 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint,, by Yongzheng Zhang (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Tue 02/18 11:56 AM
NOTICE: Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed JS-44 Related [+] Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (SDM)
Related: [-] v. 02.13.2025; Effective 02.17.2025
Monday, February 17, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/17 8:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Andrew J. Davidson, Kristi Noem, Debra A. Rogers, Kirt Thompson, U.S. Attorney's Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18771327 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Yongzheng Zhang. (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A--USCIS Filing Receipt,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B--Print Out From USCIS Website--Current Case Status,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C--Pre-Litigation Letter Sent to USCIS,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet