Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Myong J Joun
Case #: 1:25-cv-10400
Nature of Suit330 Torts - Personal Injury - Federal Employers’ Liability
Cause45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 6:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Keolis Commuter Services, LLC
Represented By
Joseph A. King
Murphy & Riley, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Elaine Derosa
Represented By
Christopher C. Naumes
The Naumes Law Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
15 15 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Thu 05/08 12:40 PM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Naumes, Robert)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 05/08 12:32 PM
CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Keolis Commuter Services, LLC.. (King, Joseph)
Related: [-]
13 13 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Thu 05/08 10:53 AM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (King, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
12 12 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/07 4:54 PM
Judge Myong J. Joun: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/4/2026 02:30 PM in Remote Proceeding before Judge Myong J. Joun. See document for additional deadlines.(JL)
Related: [-]
11 11 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 05/07 2:44 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Myong J. Joun: Scheduling Conference held on 5/7/2025. Court adopted the parties proposed schedule; parties to file Rule 16.1(3) Certifications by 5/14/2025; parties to file form re consent to jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge; parties may contact the CRD re any issue(s) that arise and/or if there is a request to participate in the Court's ADR program (mediation). (Court Reporter: Jamie Halpin at jkhhalpin@gmail.com)(Attorneys present: R. Naumes for the pltff; King for the deft) (JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
10 10 misc Recommendations for Scheduling Order Wed 04/16 2:46 PM
Recommendations for Scheduling Order . (King, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
9 9 4 pgs order Order Thu 03/27 3:05 PM
Judge Myong J. Joun: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER REGARDING MOTION PRACTICE. (SP)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Thu 03/27 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 5/7/2025 02:30 PM in Remote Proceeding before Judge Myong J. Joun. (JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/24 2:10 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Keolis Commuter Services, LLC. (King, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/21 2:11 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Keolis Commuter Services, LLC.(King, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/07 9:55 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Elaine Derosa. Keolis Commuter Services, LLC waiver sent on 2/28/2025, answer due 4/29/2025. (Naumes, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/26 1:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. King on behalf of Keolis Commuter Services, LLC (King, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 02/18 12:06 PM
Summons Issued as to Keolis Commuter Services, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (SR)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 02/18 12:00 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Myong J. Joun assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (JKK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/18 10:30 AM
COMPLAINT against Keolis Commuter Services, LLC Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10844554 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Elaine Derosa.(Naumes, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form