New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:25-cv-01380
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:706(a) Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 5:37 AM EDT
Defendant
Jennifer B. Higgins
Acting Director of the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services USCIS- Director 20 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001
Represented By
Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Kirsti Noem
Secretary of Homeland Security Secretary of Homeland Security
Washington, DC 20528
Represented By
Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Marco Rubio
Secretary of State of the United States Secretary of State 2201 C Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20520
Represented By
Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Julie Stufft
Acting Assistant, Secretary of State for Consular Affairs Acting Assitant Secretary of State 2201 C Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20520
Represented By
Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Muhammad Arshad
Represented By
Afzaal M. Sipra
Afzaal M. Sipra, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Abdul S. Choudhry
Represented By
Afzaal M. Sipra
Afzaal M. Sipra, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Aysha Nasreen
Represented By
Afzaal M. Sipra
Afzaal M. Sipra, Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 05/08 11:37 AM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The request is granted. The deadline for the Government to respond to the complaint is extended to July 8, 2025. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/8/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 05/08 11:38 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Jennifer B. Higgins answer due 7/8/2025; Kirsti Noem answer due 7/8/2025; Marco Rubio answer due 7/8/2025; Julie Stufft answer due 7/8/2025. (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time Wed 05/07 3:39 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher dated 5-7-25. Document filed by Kirsti Noem, Marco Rubio, Julie Stufft..(Ramirez-Fisher, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/24 3:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher on behalf of Jennifer B. Higgins, Kirsti Noem, Marco Rubio, Julie Stufft..(Ramirez-Fisher, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 03/05 2:57 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jennifer B. Higgins, Kirsti Noem, Marco Rubio, Julie Stufft. (vf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 03/04 3:37 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marco Rubio, Julie Stufft, Kirsti Noem, Jennifer B. Higgins, re:3 Complaint,. Document filed by Abdul S. Choudhry, Muhammad Arshad, Aysha Nasreen..(Sipra, Afzaal)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/28 2:55 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Afzaal M. Sipra to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Plaintiff party name on the PDF case caption contains a typographical error;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/27 3:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marco Rubio, Julie Stufft, Kirsti Noem, Jennifer B. Higgins, re:3 Complaint,. Document filed by Abdul S. Choudhry, Muhammad Arshad, Aysha Nasreen..(Sipra, Afzaal)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/27 1:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sipra, Afzaal)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Thu 02/27 1:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Jennifer B. Higgins, Kirsti Noem, Marco Rubio, Julie Stufft. Document filed by Abdul S. Choudhry, Aysha Nasreen, Muhammad Arshad..(Sipra, Afzaal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Visa Petition Approval Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Visa Fee Payment Receipt,
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Visa Application Confirmation,
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Letter to US Embassy
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Wed 02/19 9:36 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Afzaal M. Sipra to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Wed 02/19 9:37 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Afzaal M. Sipra to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; multiple Nature of Suit codes was selected. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 02/19 9:38 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 02/19 9:39 AM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 02/19 9:40 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 02/19 9:41 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Afzaal M. Sipra. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 02/19 9:43 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Afzaal M. Sipra. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ABDUL S. CHOUDHRY; MOHAMMAD ARSHAD; AYSHA NASREEN; Marco Rubio; Julie Stufft; Kirsti Noem; Jennifer B. Higgins. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 02/18 2:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sipra, Afzaal)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/18 2:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30634571)Document filed by ABDUL S. CHOUDHRY, AYSHA NASREEN, MOHAMMAD ARSHAD..(Sipra, Afzaal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A - VISA PETITION APPROVAL NOTICE,
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B - VISA FEE RECEIPT,
Att: 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C - VISA APPLICATION CONFIRMATION,
Att: 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D - LETTER TO US EMBASSEY ISLAMABAD