Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 1:25-cv-00009
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Case in other court:Maury County Circuit Court, 17949
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 5:45 AM CDT
Defendant
Point Dedicated Services, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Gardella
Martin, Tate, Morrow & Marston, P.C.
contact info
Lee L. Piovarcy
Martin, Tate, Morrow & Marston, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Jose Luis Reza
Represented By
Andrew Gardella
Martin, Tate, Morrow & Marston, P.C.
contact info
Lee L. Piovarcy
Martin, Tate, Morrow & Marston, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Muhammad Munir
Represented By
Zachary C. Smith
Hughes And Coleman
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
13 13 misc Proposed Case Management Order Wed 04/23 2:23 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Muhammad Munir. (Smith, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
12 12 5 pgs order Order Wed 04/09 1:37 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER of Magistrate Judge Holmes' Case Management Procedures and Instructions: The procedures shall govern all civil cases for which Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes is assigned as the Magistrate Judge for case management. These procedures are in addition to the practices and procedures detailed in Judge Holmes Practice and Procedures Manual found on the Court's website and those detailed in the Notice of Setting of Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 4/9/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
11 11 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 03/12 7:49 AM
REPLY to Response to re7 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Negligent Entrustment and Direct Negligence Claims and, to the Extent Sought, Claim for Punitive Damages filed by Point Dedicated Services, Inc.. (Gardella, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/10 2:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Jose Luis Reza.(Gardella, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
9 9 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 03/04 9:29 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Negligent Entrustment and Direct Negligence Claims and, to the Extent Sought, Claim for Punitive Damages filed by Muhammad Munir. (Smith, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/25 11:24 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Point Dedicated Services, Inc..(Gardella, Andrew)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss Tue 02/25 11:21 AM
Partial MOTION to Dismiss Negligent Entrustment and Direct Negligence Claims and, to the Extent Sought, Claim for Punitive Damages by Point Dedicated Services, Inc..(Gardella, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss Negligent Entrustment and Direct Negligence Claims and, to the extent sought, Claim for Punitive Damages
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/18 2:52 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/18/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Tue 02/18 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 5/7/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ch)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Tue 02/18 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ch)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Tue 02/18 11:57 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ch)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Tue 02/18 11:57 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ch)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 02/18 11:57 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Point Dedicated Services, Inc., Jose Luis Reza from Maury County Circuit Court, case number 17949. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNMDC-4261946)(ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Maury County Circuit Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 02/18 11:58 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Zachary C. Smith, Andrew Gardella, and Lee L. Piovarcy admitted to this court . (ch)
Related: [-]