Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-00191

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Benjamin P Hursh
Case #: 1:25-ap-06007
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Restoration Rods, LLC
8633 W State Street
Garden City, ID 83714
Represented By
Restoration Rods, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy R. Kurtz
P.O. Box 956
Boise, ID 83701
Represented By
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Sunday, April 27, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Sun 04/27 10:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 04/25 3:29 PM
Pretrial Order Signed on 4/25/2025. Trial date set for October 22-23, 2025 at 09:00 AM Boise - US Courthouse, Courtroom 4 (ck)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
11 11 court Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other) Thu 04/24 2:26 PM
Hearing Held Appearances: Matthew Christensen, Attorney for Plaintiff, Gery Edson Attorney for Defendant Report of Proceedings: The Court conducted a pre-trial hearing, the Trial will be set for October 22-23, 2025 commencing at 9:00 am each day, to be held in Boise. A pre-trial order is forthcoming. Audio File Location: Zoom-Telephone Related [+] (dj)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz,9 Notice of Hearing
Sunday, April 06, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Sun 04/06 10:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Notice Date 04/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 04/04 11:07 AM
Notice of Hearing Signed on 4/4/2025 Related [+]. Pre Trial Conference hearing to be held on 4/24/2025 at 01:30 PM Telephonic Hearing for1 , (ck)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz
Thursday, April 03, 2025
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/03 1:30 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Restoration Rods, LLC (Edson, Gery)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/24 10:50 AM
Notice of Appearance by Lauren Bouvia Filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz. (Bouvia, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
6 6 misc Acceptance of Service Thu 03/06 10:37 AM
Acceptance of Service. Filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz Related [+]. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,5 Summons Issued
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
5 5 court Summons Issued Tue 03/04 10:20 AM
Summons Issued on Restoration Rods, LLC Date Issued 3/4/2025, Answer Due 4/3/2025 (ck)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
4 4 misc Summons Mon 03/03 10:56 AM
Summons (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 02/18 5:05 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-06007 BPH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8529148. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 02/18 9:41 AM
Summons Issued on Restoration Rods, LLC Date Issued 2/18/2025, Answer Due 3/20/2025 (ck)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/17 7:36 PM
Adversary case 25-06007 13 Related [+]: Complaint by Timothy R. Kurtz against Restoration Rods, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Summons