Cunningham v. Commissioner of Social Security
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Trina L Thompson |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-01665 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Feb 18, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER GRANTING 8 PLAINTIFF'S STIPULATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Trina L Thompson on 5/12/2025. (rfm, COURT USER) |
|
8 | 8
![]() STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time filed by Wilidah Cunningham.(Palmer, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() SSA Administrative Transcript Notice of Lodging Certified Administrative Record in Electronic Form by Commissioner of Social Security.(Johann, Pamela) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Friday, February 28, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney
Fri 02/28 8:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Erin Highland on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Highland, Erin) |
|
Thursday, February 20, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Thu 02/20 1:30 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jaf, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
![]() CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wilidah Cunningham.. (Palmer, Melissa) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 02/20 2:54 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Trina L Thompson. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
||
Tuesday, February 18, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 02/18 11:58 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/4/2025. (ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20358408.). Filed by Wilidah Cunningham.(Palmer, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |