Nevada District Court
Judge:Anne R Traum
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier, III
Case #: 2:25-cv-00315
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 4:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Clarity Services, Inc.
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Represented By
Sarai Leora Brown
Skane Mills LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cynthia Magallon
Represented By
George Haines
Freedom Law Firm, Llc.
contact info
Gerardo Avalos
Freedom Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
14 14 minord Minute Order Thu 05/15 10:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 5/15/2025. By Deputy Clerk: Katie Lynn Sutherland. The Court is in receipt of and has reviewed the 13 Notice of settlement between Plaintiff and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Good cause appearing, Plaintiff shall file dismissal documents or a notice regarding the status of settlement no later than July 14, 2025. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
13 13 notice Notice Other Tue 05/13 3:36 PM
NOTICE of settlement with Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Cynthia Magallon re1 Complaint,,. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
12 12 minord Minute Order Tue 05/06 5:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 5/6/2025. By Deputy Clerk: Katie Lynn Sutherland. The Court is in receipt of and has reviewed the 11 Notice of settlement between Plaintiff and Clarity Services, Inc. Good cause appearing, Plaintiff and Clarity Services, Inc. shall have up to and including July 7, 2025, to file dismissal documents or a joint notice regarding the status of settlement. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KLS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
11 11 notice Notice Other Thu 05/01 12:03 PM
NOTICE of settlement with Clarity Services, Inc. by Cynthia Magallon re1 Complaint,,. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
10 10 minord Minute Order Tue 04/29 11:06 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 4/29/2025. By Deputy Clerk: Katie Lynn Sutherland. The Court is in receipt of and has reviewed the 9 Notice of settlement between Plaintiff and Trans Union LLC. Good cause appearing, Plaintiff and Trans Union LLC shall have up to and including June 30, 2025, to file dismissal documents or a joint notice regarding the status of settlement. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
9 9 notice Notice Other Fri 04/25 11:28 AM
NOTICE of settlement with Trans Union LLC by Cynthia Magallon re1 Complaint,,. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
8 8 order Standing Order Wed 03/26 12:24 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. Judge Couvillier's Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
7 7 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 03/14 4:33 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Trans Union LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., a publicly-traded entity, Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Trans Union LLC added. (Brown, Sarai)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/14 4:31 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Trans Union LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/24/2025. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/28/2025.(Brown, Sarai)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Fri 03/14 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarai Leora Brown on behalf of Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Brown, Sarai)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/06 11:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia Magallon re1 Complaint,,. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 2/21/2025. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 02/19 9:58 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Clarity Services, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union LLC re1 Complaint. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 02/18 12:32 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cynthia Magallon. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/18 12:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7959427) by Cynthia Magallon. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/28/2025. Proof of service due by 5/19/2025. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Trans Union,
Att: 3 Summons Experian,
Att: 4 Summons Clarity
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Wed 02/19 9:56 AM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. (CAH)
Related: [-]