Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Philip P Simon
Referred: John E Martin
Case #: 2:25-cv-00075
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Case in other court:Tippecanoe Superior Court, 79D02-2501-PL-000023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 6:49 AM EDT
Defendant
Discovery Senior Living Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Chad H Holler
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Brian L McDermott
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Discovery Indiana Employer, LLC
Represented By
Chad H Holler
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Brian L McDermott
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Cynthia O'Neal
Represented By
Jason R Ramsland
Ramsland Law - Car/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
10 10 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Wed 04/16 4:05 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 04/16 4:05 PM
ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2025 10:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 5/9/2025.Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/16/2025. (smb)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order Wed 04/16 4:01 PM
TEXT ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/16/2025. (smb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/25 4:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Discovery Indiana Employer, LLC, Discovery Senior Living Holdings, LLC.(McDermott, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 02/20 4:35 PM
**NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (kmt)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 02/20 4:43 PM
Reset Deadlines: Discovery Indiana Employer, LLC and Discovery Senior Living Holdings, LLC Answer due 3/25/2025 pursuant to DE5 . (kmt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
5 5 notice Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer Wed 02/19 12:25 PM
AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Discovery Indiana Employer, LLC d/b/a Digby Place, Discovery Senior Living Holdings, LLC ; answer due by March 25, 2025. (McDermott, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
4 4 notice Notice - Other Tue 02/18 4:59 PM
NOTICE by Discovery Indiana Employer, LLC d/b/a Digby Place, Discovery Senior Living Holdings, LLC Proof of Service and Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court (McDermott, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chad H Holler on behalf of Discovery Indiana Employer, LLC d/b/a Digby Place, Discovery Senior Living Holdings, LLC (Holler, Chad)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L McDermott on behalf of Discovery Indiana Employer, LLC d/b/a Digby Place, Discovery Senior Living Holdings, LLC (McDermott, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 02/18 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5818914.) from Tippecanoe Superior Court 2, Cause No. 79D02-2501-PL-000023, filed by Discovery Senior Living Holdings, LLC, Discovery Indiana Employer, LLC d/b/a Digby Place.(McDermott, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summonses,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court Documents (Docket, Complaint, Summonses, and Appearance),
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
Monday, January 27, 2025
6 6 cmp State Court Complaint Thu 02/20 4:32 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Discovery Indiana Employer, LLC, Discovery Senior Living Holdings, LLC, filed by Cynthia O'Neal in Tippecanoe Superior Court 79D02-2501-PL-000023.(kmt)
Related: [-]