Santos v. FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL FLORIDA, INC.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cecilia M Altonaga |
Referred: | Lisette M Reid |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-20754 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Feb 18, 2025 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 6:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL FLORIDA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Manuel Santos
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, April 10, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Mediator Marlene Quintana, Esq. Mediation Hearing set for 9/30/2025 10:00 AM. The parties are reminded that a report of their mediation must be filed within seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/10/2025. See attached document for full details. (ps1) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Joint NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. Selected/Added Marlene Quintana, Esq. as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for September 30, 2025 at 10:00 a.m..(Rodman, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Certificate of Other Affiliates by Manuel Santos (Adan, Elvis) |
|
Friday, March 28, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER re7 Order Requiring Certificates of Interested Parties; Plaintiff shall comply with the March 17, 2025 Order by April 1, 2025. Furthermore, in his written submission, Plaintiff shall explain why he failed to comply with the March 17, 2025 Order, necessitating this second Order. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/28/2025. See attached document for full details. (ps1) |
|
Tuesday, March 25, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER Setting Trial and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge: Trial set for two-week period beginning 1/26/2026 in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 1/20/2026 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Mediation Deadline 10/10/2025. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid for Discovery Matters. Motions to amend pleadings or join parties due by 4/15/2025. All discovery, including expert discovery, Discovery due by 10/6/2025. In Limine Motions due by 12/2/2025. Motions due by 10/20/2025. Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/2/2025. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/25/2025. See attached document for full details. (ps1) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule by FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL FLORIDA, INC.(Rodman, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, March 17, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 3/27/2025. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/17/2025. See attached document for full details. (ps1) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL FLORIDA, INC.. (Rodman, Andrew) |
|
Friday, March 14, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL FLORIDA, INC. identifying Corporate Parent FirstService Residential, Inc., Other Affiliate FirstService Corporation, Other Affiliate CHUBB Insurance for FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL FLORIDA, INC. (Rodman, Andrew) |
|
Friday, March 07, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER requiring proof of service by 5/19/2025. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (ps1) |
|
Wednesday, February 19, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL FLORIDA, INC. (scn) |
|
Tuesday, February 18, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 02/19 8:29 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (scn) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL FLORIDA, INC.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18213917, filed by Manuel Santos.(Adan, Elvis) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |