Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joel T Marker
Case #: 2:25-bk-20752
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Capstone Consulting, LLC
1755 N 1780 E
North Logan, UT 84341-2193
Represented By
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Washington Federal Bank Bldg. 405 South Main Street Suite 300
Salt Lake City, UT 84111


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
29 29 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 05/21 1:46 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/28/2025 Filed by Capstone Consulting, LLC. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
28 28 misc Amended Schedules/List of Creditors/Statements (Dec 1 2016) Fri 05/16 2:44 PM
Amended Schedules G. Filed by Capstone Consulting, LLC. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Fri 05/16 12:26 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Capstone Consulting, LLC. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-] 26 Notice
26 26 notice Notice Fri 05/16 12:20 PM
Notice Related [+] (Notice of Filing Purchase and Sale Agreement (D.R. Horton, Inc.)) Filed by Capstone Consulting, LLC. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f) filed by Debtor Capstone Consulting, LLC
25 25 misc Chapter 11 Plan Fri 05/16 11:40 AM
Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization (Plan of Liquidation Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code) Filed by Capstone Consulting, LLC. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
24 24 order Examination Under Rule 2004 (order) Thu 05/15 7:11 AM
Order Granting Motion For Examination Under Rule 2004 Related [+]. Person or Entity Being Examined: Capital Community Bank (gci)
Related: [-] 22
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
23 23 misc Pending Order Wed 05/14 4:07 PM
Pending Order Re:22 Motion for Examination Under Rule 2004. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Examination Under Rule 2004 (Motion) Wed 05/14 4:07 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Examination Under Rule 2004 of Capital Community Bank Filed by Capstone Consulting, LLC. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
21 21 answer Response Mon 05/12 6:32 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Shree Giriraj Ji, Inc. (Lambert, Reid)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f)
Monday, April 28, 2025
20 20 answer Objection Mon 04/28 2:09 PM
Objection to Related [+] Filed by Graybird LLC, Providence Lending Fund, LP. (Dorius, Nathan)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f)
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/22 4:27 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Capstone Consulting, LLC. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f),18 Notice of Hearing
18 18 notice *Notice of Hearing Tue 04/22 3:36 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Filed by Capstone Consulting, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/3/2025 at 02:00 PM at ZoomGov.com/join - JTM: Meeting ID: 161 5478 8875, Passcode: 3834658, Phone 1-669-254-5252. Deadline for filing objections: 5/12/2025. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f)
17 17 26 pgs motion Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) (FEE)(Motion) Tue 04/22 3:32 PM
Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) (Debtor's Motion for Order Approving Sale of Real Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Interests; and to Approve Use of Proceeds to Pay Secured Debt (D.R. Horton, Inc.) . Property to be sold: 48 Build-Ready Lots ("The Mountainside Estates Subdivision") Located at Approximately 1200 East 1400 North, Logan Utah. Fee Amount: $199. Filed by Capstone Consulting, LLC. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
crditcrd PayGov Receipt of Fee Due Tue 04/22 3:33 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f)([LINK 25-20752 ) [motion,mselfclf] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A28211316, Amount $ 199.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#17
Monday, April 21, 2025
16 16 46 pgs misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 1:44 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Capstone Consulting, LLC. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/11 11:54 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Capstone Consulting, LLC. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f),14 Notice of Hearing
14 14 notice *Notice of Hearing Fri 04/11 11:43 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Filed by Capstone Consulting, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/3/2025 at 02:00 PM at ZoomGov.com/join - JTM: Meeting ID: 161 5478 8875, Passcode: 3834658, Phone 1-669-254-5252. Deadline for filing objections: 4/28/2025. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f)
13 13 32 pgs motion Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) (FEE)(Motion) Fri 04/11 11:38 AM
Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) (Debtor's Motion for Order Approving Sale of Real Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Interests; and to Approve Use of Proceeds to Pay Interest on Secured Debt (Boundary Adjustment Sale)) . Property to be sold: 48 Build-Ready Lots located at approximately 1200 E 1400 N, Logan UT. Fee Amount: $199. Filed by Capstone Consulting, LLC. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
crditcrd PayGov Receipt of Fee Due Fri 04/11 11:39 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f)([LINK 25-20752 ) [motion,mselfclf] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A28181819, Amount $ 199.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#13
Monday, March 24, 2025
12 12 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 03/24 3:49 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/28/2025 Filed by Capstone Consulting, LLC. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
11 11 trustee USTR's Minute Entry (341) Fri 03/21 10:57 AM
USTR's Minute Entry (341) filed by USTR. (Willden tr, Melinda)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (No Image) Fri 03/21 1:41 PM
Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice. Creditor Added: Cache County. Filed by Cache County Treasurer. (Davis, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
notice Withdrawal of Document (no image) Thu 03/20 12:02 PM
Withdrawal of Document. Reason for Withdrawal: The requested information and documents have been provided. Related [+] Filed by United States Trustee. (Willden tr, Melinda)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee, Motion to Dismiss Case
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
10 10 motion Convert Case to 7 (FEE) (Motion) Wed 03/19 3:33 PM
Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 Fee Amount: 15, or in the alternative Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by United States Trustee. (Willden tr, Melinda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
9 9 order Employ Attorney (order) Tue 03/18 12:12 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ Attorney George Hofmann and the firm of Cohne Kinghorn, P.C. Related [+] (gci)
Related: [-] 3
8 8 misc Pending Order Tue 03/18 10:24 AM
Pending Order Re:3 Application to Employ Attorney. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
7 7 cmp Complaint Mon 03/10 8:30 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 25-02024 . Complaint by Capstone Consulting, LLC against Shree Giriraj Ji, Inc. Graybird Capital, LLC, Providence Capital, LLC, Brent Fredrickson, Jacob Fredrickson, LCH HEMA Fund, LLC, Cache County Treasurer's Office. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h)), 91 (Declaratory judgment)]. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
6 6 27 pgs misc Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules Mon 03/03 4:19 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, and Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Capstone Consulting, LLC. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 23, 2025
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 02/23 10:18 PM
341 Meeting Notice (see image for details) and BNC Certificate of Service. Related [+] Notice Date 02/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] Notice Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Friday, February 21, 2025
court Notice of Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Fri 02/21 9:40 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/20/2025 via Chapter 11 341 Mtg Teleconference Line. Proofs of Claims due by 6/18/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/18/2025. (mkh)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (No Image) Fri 02/21 2:08 PM
Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice. Filed by Providence Lending Fund, LP, Graybird LLC. (Dorius, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
4 4 misc Chapter 11 Guidelines for Debtors in Possession and Trustees Wed 02/19 7:47 AM
Chapter 11 Guidelines for Debtors in Possession and Trustees Filed by United States Trustee. (Willden tr, Melinda)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (No Image) Wed 02/19 7:48 AM
Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice. Filed by United States Trustee. (Willden tr, Melinda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
3 3 8 pgs motion Employ Attorney (Motion) Tue 02/18 4:35 PM
Application to Employ George Hofmann and the law firm of Cohne Kinghorn, P.C. as Attorney Filed by Capstone Consulting, LLC. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
2 2 7 pgs genaty 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Tue 02/18 4:24 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders, Equity Security Holders , Verification of Creditor Matrix and Corporate Ownership Statement . Filed by Capstone Consulting, LLC. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (FEE) Tue 02/18 4:20 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Capstone Consulting, LLC. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
crditcrd PayGov Receipt of Fee Due Tue 02/18 4:22 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-20752 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A28028412, Amount $1738.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload Tue 02/18 4:26 PM
Creditor(s) uploaded (24 creditors). (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]