Wisconsin Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Beth E Hanan
Case #: 3:25-bk-10326
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025

Debtor
PinSeekers DeForest Operations LLC
PO Box 5065
Coralville, IA 52241-0065
Represented By
Rebecca R. DeMarb
Demarb Brophy LLC
contact info
James D. Sweet
Swanson Sweet LLP
contact info
Peter T. Nowak
Swanson Sweet LLP
contact info
Virginia E. George
Swanson Sweet LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee's Office
780 Regent Street, Suite 304
Madison, WI 53715


Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
122 122 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 05/01 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #121 )
utility Update Claim Thu 05/01 4:41 PM
Update Claims History: Modified address to 1050 Lillian St. Suite 300 Waunakee, WI 53597 (Eau Claire, Janis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
121 121 2 pgs order Order (generic) Tue 04/29 1:24 PM
Notice and Order Conditionally Approving Payment of March 2025 Invoice from Swanson Sweet LLP Pursuant to the Order Approving Alternative Compensation Procedures cc: parties in int. Related [+] Signed on 4/29/2025. (Eau Claire, Janis)
Related: [-] 116
Friday, April 25, 2025
120 120 misc Proposed Order - attorney Fri 04/25 8:27 AM
Proposed Order - Conditionally Approving Payment of March 2025 Invoice from Swanson Sweet LLP Pursuant to the Order Approving Alternative Compensation Procedures Related [+] filed by Attorney Peter T. Nowak of Swanson Sweet LLP on behalf of Swanson Sweet LLP. Order to be signed on or after 4/25/2025. (Nowak, Peter)
Related: [-] 116 Notice of Filing filed by Attorney Swanson Sweet LLP
Thursday, April 24, 2025
utility Update Claim Thu 04/24 1:32 PM
Update Claims History: Modified address to PO Box 7346 Philadelphia PA 19101-7346 (Eau Claire, Janis)
Related: [-]