California Northern District Court
Judge:Eumi K Lee
Case #: 5:25-cv-01701
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:145 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 3:16 AM PDT
Defendant
Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By
Derek C. Walter
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Edward Robert Reines
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff
California Institute of Technology
Represented By
Bradley C. Graveline
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Jesse A Salen
Sheppard Mullin Richter Hampton LLP
contact info
Martin Randall Bader
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
24 24 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 05/14 11:07 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by California Institute of Technology (Salen, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
23 23 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 05/05 2:58 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim by California Institute of Technology. (Bader, Martin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 04/14 3:45 PM
Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against California Institute of Technology by Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc.. (Walter, Derek)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
21 21 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Mon 03/03 4:15 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 6/4/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Eumi K. Lee. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom meeting. Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who will be present at the hearing. A list of names and emails, including identification of main speaker and party represented, must be sent to the CRD at eklcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 6/16/2025 at 5:00PM PT. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrt, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 03/03 12:34 PM
STIPULATION [Joint Stipulation To Enlarge Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint] filed by Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc.. (Walter, Derek)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 03/03 12:30 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc. (Walter, Derek)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 03/03 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Derek C. Walter on behalf of Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc. (Walter, Derek)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 03/03 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Edward Robert Reines on behalf of Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] ines, Edward
16 16 1 pgs order Order Relating Case Mon 03/03 8:32 AM
ORDER RELATING CASE. This case, 5:25-cv-1701-BLF, is related to 5:23-cv-4823-EKL and shall be reassigned to Judge Eumi K. Lee. Signed by Judge Eumi K. Lee on 3/3/2025. (lrt, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/03 11:15 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is directly assigned to Judge Eumi K Lee. Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order Tue 02/25 11:19 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE IN THE LOWEST-NUMBERED CASE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/25/2025. (blflc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/24 5:08 PM
NOTICE by California Institute of Technology of Related Case (Salen, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/21 5:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by California Institute of Technology. Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc. served on 2/21/2025, answer due 3/14/2025. (Salen, Jesse)
Related: [-]
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/21 5:14 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2025 11:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
11 11 order ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 02/20 1:16 PM
Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case, except for discovery purposes. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Thu 02/20 10:54 AM
Summons Issued as to Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc.. (jlm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 02/20 10:52 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 02/20 10:58 AM
Copy of3 Report of the filing of an action regarding PATENT INFRINGEMENT emailed to USPTO. (jlm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
8 8 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 02/20 10:44 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (jlm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 02/19 3:48 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Institute of Technology.. (Salen, Jesse)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 02/19 3:34 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/5/2025. (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 02/19 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Jesse A Salen on behalf of California Institute of Technology (Salen, Jesse)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 02/19 1:51 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by California Institute of Technology and Corporate Disclosure (Bader, Martin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report Wed 02/19 1:47 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Bader, Martin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 02/18 5:21 PM
Proposed Summons. (Bader, Martin)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/18 5:16 PM
COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against California Institute of Technology ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20362377.). Filed by California Institute of Technology.(Bader, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - US Patent 12,168,797,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Press Release re Bio-Rad's QX600 Droplet Digital PCR SystemDigital,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - QX600 Droplet Digital System,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - QX Droplet Reader and QX Manager Software, Standard Edition, User Guide,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Bio-Rad Bulletin 3557,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Bio-Rad Bulletin 6512,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet