New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Allyne R Ross
Referred: Peggy Kuo
Case #: 1:25-cv-00932
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 6:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Air Company Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Brett Berman
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Joseph Sweeny
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Stafford Sheehan
Represented By
Joni Jacobsen
Dechert LLP
contact info
Bina M. Peltz
Dechert, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
order Order(Other) Mon 05/12 11:03 AM
ORDER re22 Letter filed by Air Company Holdings, Inc. Defendant's request for additional time is granted. Defendant shall file its answer and amended counterclaims by May 30, 2025. Plaintiff may renew his motion to dismiss those counterclaims by June 11, 2025. Defendant's opposition shall be due by June 20, 2025. Plaintiff's reply shall be due by July 1, 2025. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 5/12/2025. (HTK)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
22 22 misc Letter Fri 05/09 7:34 PM
Letter by Air Company Holdings, Inc. (Berman, Brett)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/09 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Abaigeal Franson on behalf of Air Company Holdings, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Franson, Abaigeal)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/09 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elior Daniel Shiloh on behalf of Air Company Holdings, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Shiloh, Elior)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
order Order(Other) Tue 05/06 11:25 AM
ORDER: Having reviewed dockets 25-cv-00932 and 25-cv-02463, I consolidate both matters. All entries are to be made in the 25-cv-00932 matter. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to consolidate these matters and close docket 25-cv-02463. Air Company Holdings, Inc. ("AirCo") is directed to file its complaint in 25-cv-02463 as counterclaims in its answer in the 25-cv-00932 matter. AirCo is granted leave to amend its allegations in support of those claims/counterclaims. I set the following deadlines: AirCo shall file its answer and amended counterclaims by May 16, 2025. Dr. Sheehan may renew his motion to dismiss those counterclaims, previously filed and dismissed without prejudice in the 25-cv-02463 matter, by May 28, 2025. AirCo's opposition shall be due by June 6, 2025. Dr. Sheehan's reply shall be due by June 17, 2025. The parties are directed to file a letter by May 9, 2025 should they desire an alternative briefing schedule. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 5/6/2025. (HTK)
Related: [-]
utility Case Consolidated Tue 05/06 11:46 AM
Case Consolidated with member case 25cv2463 ARR). (RG)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 05/05 9:57 AM
ORDER denying10 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Air Company Holdings, Inc.'s first-filed case in the District of Delaware has been dismissed and transferred to this district as 25-cv-02463. Defendant's motion to dismiss or transfer this case to the D. Del. is therefore DENIED as moot. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 5/5/2025. (HTK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
19 19 cmp Complaint Thu 05/01 4:54 PM
COMPLAINT [UNREDACTED] against Air Company Holdings, Inc. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Stafford Sheehan. (Jacobsen, Joni)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
18 18 notice Notice(Other) Thu 05/01 4:28 PM
NOTICE by Stafford Sheehan of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Jacobsen, Joni)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
17 17 1 pgs misc Letter Fri 04/18 3:40 PM
Letter requesting Oral Argument by Air Company Holdings, Inc. (Sweeny, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
16 16 respoth Reply in Support Thu 04/10 3:36 PM
REPLY in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Air Company Holdings, Inc.. (Sweeny, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/02 7:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Sweeny on behalf of Air Company Holdings, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Sweeny, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
14 14 motion Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal Thu 03/27 10:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal by Stafford Sheehan. (Jacobsen, Joni)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Opposition [SEALED]
13 13 29 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Thu 03/27 10:09 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re10 MOTION to Dismiss or transfer this action filed by Stafford Sheehan. (Jacobsen, Joni)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Stafford Sheehan In Support
Thursday, March 13, 2025
order Order(Other) Thu 03/13 5:34 PM
ORDER: I am in receipt of Defendant's motion to dismiss and Plaintiff's letter outlining his opposition. Notwithstanding Defendant's failure to request a pre-motion conference, I have reviewed both submissions and concluded that a pre-motion conference is not necessary. The deadline or plaintiff's opposition to the motion is March 27, 2025. Defendant's reply, if any, is due no later than April 10, 2025. The parties may file the opposition and reply directly on the docket, without adhering to bundling rules.In the future, the parties are reminded to consult and adhere to my Individual Rules. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 3/13/2025. (CP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
12 12 2 pgs misc Letter Wed 03/12 10:15 AM
Letter Regarding Defendant Air Company Holdings, Inc.s Motion to Transfer re [ECF No. 10] by Stafford Sheehan (Jacobsen, Joni)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 55 pgs Exhibit A
Monday, March 10, 2025
11 11 18 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 03/10 11:48 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re10 MOTION to Dismiss or transfer this action filed by Air Company Holdings, Inc.. (Berman, Brett)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs motion Dismiss Mon 03/10 11:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or transfer this action by Air Company Holdings, Inc.. (Berman, Brett)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/10 8:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Berman on behalf of Air Company Holdings, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Berman, Brett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 5:02 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion to Seal and Exhibits [ECF No. 3] served on Air Company Holdings on 2/24/25, filed by Stafford Sheehan. (Jacobsen, Joni)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/27 4:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stafford Sheehan. Air Company Holdings, Inc. served on 2/24/2025, answer due 3/17/2025. (Jacobsen, Joni)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
6 6 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 02/21 3:37 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 02/21 3:36 PM
Summons Issued as to Air Company Holdings, Inc.. (CV)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 02/21 3:36 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CV)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 02/21 3:34 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
3 3 motion Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal Tue 02/18 7:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal by Stafford Sheehan. (Jacobsen, Joni)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 6:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bina M. Peltz on behalf of Stafford Sheehan (aty to be noticed) (Peltz, Bina)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/18 6:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Air Company Holdings, Inc. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18776113 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Stafford Sheehan. (Jacobsen, Joni)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 11 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 8 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 2 pgs Summons