Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Marcia A Crone
Referred: Zack Hawthorn
Case #: 9:25-cv-00058
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Terminated:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 19, 2025 9:08 PM CST
Defendant
Dolly S.
Defendant
Unknown Lunoy
Defendant
Unknown Maxey
Defendant
C. McEwin
Defendant
M. Miller
Defendant
Unknown Monroy
Defendant
L. Murphy
Defendant
Unknown Odak
Defendant
Unknown Ray
Defendant
Unknown Loyd
Defendant
R. Sarumi
Defendant
K. Stoker
Defendant
B. Sullivan
Defendant
D. Sullivan
Defendant
Unknown Vacant
Defendant
Sr. Warden Villalobos
Defendant
T. Warren
Defendant
B. Weems
Defendant
C. Lastice
Defendant
Dr Unknown Brown
Defendant
Unknown Calhoun
Defendant
R. Camble
Defendant
Officer Unknown Daniels
Defendant
Unknown Dotson
Defendant
Unknown Dubose
Defendant
R. Espinoza
Defendant
M. Graham
Defendant
A. Harrison
Defendant
Unknown Hightower
Defendant
Unknown Keoroi
Defendant
Unknown Kidd
Defendant
Carolee King
Defendant
L. Langley
Plaintiff
Michael Wisniewski
00795317 JESTER III UNIT 3 Jester Road
Richmond, TX 77406


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
9 9 order Judgment Mon 05/05 9:58 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT that this civil rights action is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). All motions not previously ruled on are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/2/25. mailed to: Wisniewski(ljw)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Mon 05/05 9:56 AM
ORDER adopting5 Report and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/2/25. mailed to: Wisniewski(ljw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
7 7 misc Mail Returned Undeliverable Wed 04/09 11:26 AM
Mail sent to Michael Wisniewski returned as undeliverable re5 Report and Recommendations. (ljw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
6 6 misc Mail Returned Undeliverable Mon 03/31 3:48 PM
Mail sent to Michael Wisniewski returned as undeliverable re4 Order. Envelope is marked "Return to Sender, Unable to Forward". (KMH)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 30, 2025
5 5 motion Report and Recommendations Mon 03/31 2:20 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS to dismiss1 Complaint without prejudice for want of prosecution. Objections due within 14 days of receipt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 03/30/2025. Mailed to Wisniewski w/ ackn card on 03/31/25.(bmf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/04 3:59 PM
PRELIMINARY FILING FEE ORDER : Plaintiff shall, within twenty (20) days from the date of this order, either pay the $405.00 filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a statement certified by an authorized prison official showing the average balance in and deposits into Plaintiff's prisoner trust account for the preceding six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 3/4/2025. (CC: by mail, Wisniewski). (KMH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/18 1:18 PM
ORDER that the Clerk of Court is directed to SEVER the claims of the forty-one additional plaintiffs from this action and assign such claims to separate civil rights actions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 2/18/25. cc by mail: Lively(ljw)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Tue 02/18 3:29 PM
Case referred to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (KMH)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 02/18 3:30 PM
This case has been severed from 9:25cv31 and only contains claims filed by Plaintiff Michael Wisniewski. (KMH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
2 2 Letter to the Court from Tommy Lively with exhibits attached. (ljw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Envelope
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tommy Gene Lively and all Plaintiffs.(ljw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Case referred to Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. (ljw)
Related: [-]