Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Marcia A Crone
Referred: Zack Hawthorn
Case #: 9:25-cv-00070
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Terminated:May 14, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 19, 2025 9:11 PM CST
Defendant
Dolly S.
Defendant
Unknown Lunoy
Defendant
Unknown Maxey
Defendant
C. McEwin
Defendant
M. Miller
Defendant
Unknown Monroy
Defendant
L. Murphy
Defendant
Unknown Odak
Defendant
Unknown Ray
Defendant
Unknown Loyd
Defendant
R. Sarumi
Defendant
K. Stoker
Defendant
B. Sullivan
Defendant
D. Sullivan
Defendant
Unknown Vacant
Defendant
Sr. Warden Villalobos
Defendant
T. Warren
Defendant
B. Weems
Defendant
M. Graham
Defendant
Dr Unknown Brown
Defendant
Unknown Calhoun
Defendant
R. Camble
Defendant
Officer Unknown Daniels
Defendant
Unknown Dotson
Defendant
Unknown Dubose
Defendant
R. Espinoza
Defendant
A. Harrison
Defendant
Unknown Hightower
Defendant
Unknown Keoroi
Defendant
Unknown Kidd
Defendant
Carolee King
Defendant
L. Langley
Defendant
C. Lastice
Plaintiff
Byron Lee Glass
875595 JESTER III UNIT 3 Jester Road
Richmond, TX 77406


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
9 9 order Judgment Thu 05/15 8:51 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT that plaintiff take nothing, and this lawsuit is DISMISSED without prejudice. All motions by either party not previously ruled on are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/14/25. cc by mail: Glass(ljw)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Thu 05/15 8:49 AM
ORDER adopting6 Report and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/14/25. cc by mail: Glass(ljw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
7 7 misc Mail Returned Undeliverable Mon 04/21 1:47 PM
Mail sent to Bryon Lee Glass returned as undeliverable re6 Report and Recommendation. Envelope marked "Return To Sender - Not Deliverable As Addressed - Unable To Forward". (KMR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
6 6 motion Report and Recommendations Wed 04/09 3:44 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending denying the1 Complaint by Byron Lee Glass. Objections due within 14 days of receipt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 4/09/2025. Mail type: Regular mail with Inmate ack. req. on 04/09/25. Objections due within 14 days of receipt. (KMR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
5 5 misc Mail Returned Undeliverable Tue 04/08 3:08 PM
Mail sent to Byron Lee Glass returned as undeliverable re4 Preliminary Filing Fee Order. Envelope marked "Unable to Forward - Discharged". (bmf)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/24 9:09 AM
PRELIMINARY FILING FEE ORDER : Plaintiff shall, within twenty (20) days from the date of this order, submit either the $405.00 filing fee or an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a statement certified by an authorized prison official showing the average balance in, and deposits into, Plaintiff's inmate trust account for the preceding six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 3/21/2025. (CC: by mail, Glass). (KMH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/18 1:18 PM
ORDER that the Clerk of Court is directed to SEVER the claims of the forty-one additional plaintiffs from this action and assign such claims to separate civil rights actions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 2/18/25. cc by mail: Lively(ljw)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Tue 02/18 3:53 PM
Case referred to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (KMH)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 02/18 3:53 PM
This case has been severed from 9:25cv31 and only contains claims filed by Plaintiff Byron Lee Glass. (KMH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
2 2 Letter to the Court from Tommy Lively with exhibits attached. (ljw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Envelope
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tommy Gene Lively and all Plaintiffs.(ljw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Case referred to Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. (ljw)
Related: [-]