California Central District Court
Judge:Anne Hwang
Referred: Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 2:25-cv-01366
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2025
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 4:01 AM PDT
Defendant
Office of Bar Admission
Defendant
Ohio Supreme Court
Plaintiff
Harry William Lott
2680 Sealy Ridge Road
Vincent, OH 45784


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
14 14 appeal USCA Notification of Case Number Fri 04/11 10:11 AM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 25-2264 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,12 as to plaintiff Harry William Lott. (mat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
13 13 appeal Filing Fee Letter (A-15CV) Thu 04/03 9:18 AM
FILING FEE LETTER issued as to plaintiff Harry William Lott, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,12 . (mat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
12 12 appeal Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Thu 04/03 8:38 AM
MOTION TO NOTICE OF APPEAL AND MOTION OF NOTICE OF FRCP59(e) to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Harry William Lott. Appeal of Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)11 Filed On: 3/31/25; Entered On: 3/31/25; Filing fee $ 605. Billed. (mat)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
11 11 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Mon 03/31 11:45 AM
ORDER by Judge Anne Hwang DENYING REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)2 . This case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.(MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 08, 2025
10 10 motion Amend/Correct Mon 03/10 2:20 PM
MOTION TO AMEND1 filed by Plaintiff Harry William Lott. (san)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
9 9 order Order Tue 02/25 3:38 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's proof of service. (ECF8 .) Plaintiff is advised that service is premature and, because the Court has not yet issued a summons in this action, Plaintiff's service of the complaint could not have complied with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Accordingly, Plaintiff's proof of service is ordered stricken. Plaintiff is advised that this action is pending consideration of his request to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. (ECF 2.) Should the Court grant Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court will screen the complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2)(B). The Court will take no further action regarding the issuance of a summons and service of the complaint at this time. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ORDER. NO PDF ATTACHED. (tsn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
8 8 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 02/24 12:59 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Harry William Lott, re Complaint - Related [+]1 served on 2/22/2025. Receipt attached by U S Postal Service. (es)
Related: [-] ferred
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
7 7 motion Amend/Correct Fri 02/21 10:50 AM
MOTION TO AMEND; MOTION TO ADD CLAIM to Complaint - Related [+]1 filed by Plaintiff Harry William Lott. (san)
Related: [-] ferred
6 6 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Tue 02/18 6:19 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Anne Hwang and referred to Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 02/18 6:17 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support2 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete or incorrect. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
4 4 motion Stay Order (other) Tue 02/18 6:13 PM
MOTION TO STAY filed by Plaintiff Harry William Lott. (et)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 Tue 02/18 6:10 PM
APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Harry William Lott. (et)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Tue 02/18 6:09 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Harry William Lott. (et)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Referred) Tue 02/18 6:07 PM
COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Office of Bar Admission, Ohio Supreme Court Case assigned to Judge Anne Hwang and referred to Magistrate Judge Stephanie S Christensen., filed by Plaintiff Harry William Lott. (et)
Related: [-]