Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas M Horan
Case #: 1:25-bk-10258
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Nikola Corporation
4141 East Broadway Road
Phoenix, AZ 85040
Represented By
Shannon Forshay
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Caroline Tart
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
M. Blake Cleary
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Sarah R Gladieux
Potter Anderson & Corroon
contact info
Jonathan Doolittle
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Brett Michael Haywood
Potter Anderson & Corroon
contact info
Joshua D Morse
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Maria Kotsiras
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Andrew V. Alfano
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Chazz C. Coleman
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 9:26 PM EDT
Claims Agent
Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC
www.epiqsystems.com 777 Third Avenue, 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Cred. Comm. Chair
Antara Capital LP
55 Hudson Yards 47th Floor, Suite C
New York, NY 10001
Cred. Comm. Chair
Aztek Technologies S.A. DE C.V.
Cred. Comm. Chair
Duotec de Norteamrica S de RL de CV
Cred. Comm. Chair
Fiedler Group
299 N. Euclid Avenue Suite 550
Pasadena, CA 91101
Cred. Comm. Chair
Hexagon Purus GmbH
3335 Susan Street
Costa Mesa, CA 25350
Cred. Comm. Chair
Proterra Powered LLC
1815 Rollins Road
Burlingame, CA 94010
Represented By
Richard C. Minott
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Sean A. O'Neal
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Sean T. Greecher
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Creditor
Maricopa County Treasurer
May Potenza Baran & Gillespie, PC 1850 N. Central Avenue Suite 1600
Phoenix, AZ 85004
Represented By
Grant L. Cartwright
May, Potenza, Baran & Gillespie, P.C.
contact info
Eric Moats
May Potenza Baran & Gillespie
contact info
Creditor
EVCO GmbH
Represented By
Joshua Brooks
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
James L. Bromley
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Adam G. Landis
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Creditor
Iveco S.p.A.
Represented By
Joshua Brooks
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
James L. Bromley
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Adam G. Landis
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Creditor
ISSO, LLC
Represented By
Gerald L. Shelley
Fennemore Craig, P.C.
contact info
Ricardo Palacio, Esq
Ashby & Geddes, P. A.
contact info
Creditor
Air Liquide Hydrogen Energy U.S. LLC
Represented By
Lucian Borders Murley
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Creditor
Allison Transmission, Inc.
Represented By
William D. Sullivan
Sullivan Hazeltine Allinson LLC
contact info
Creditor
American Air Liquide Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Lucian Borders Murley
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Creditor
Aztek Technologies S.A. DE C.V.
Represented By
Ronald S. Gellert
Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Carter Machinery Company Inc.
Represented By
Mackenzie R. Pensyl
Crenshaw, Ware & Martin, P.L.C.
contact info
Donald C. Schultz
Crenshaw, Ware & Martin, P.L.C.
contact info
Gregory T. Donilon
Montgomery Mccracken Walker & Rhoads LLP
contact info
Creditor
Integrated Cryogenic Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
KL Coatings
16463 Phoebe Ave
La Mirada, CA 90638
Creditor
FPT Industrial S.p.A.
Represented By
Joshua Brooks
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
James L. Bromley
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Adam G. Landis
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Creditor
Muelles Y Ballestas Hispano Alemanas, S.L.
Represented By
Frederick Brian Rosner
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Creditor
Servicio De Ingenieria Industrial y Outsourcing SA DE CV
Represented By
Jenny Kasen
Kasen & Kasen
contact info
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202
Represented By
Laura L. McCloud
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Tetra Tech, Inc.
Represented By
Jason Daniel Angelo
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Tom's Truck Center, Inc.
Represented By
Richard W. Riley
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, a Professional Corporation c/o Shawn M. Christianson, Esq. 425 Market St., Suite 2900
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter PC
contact info
Creditor
Lead Class Plaintiffs
Represented By
Mark Bryne
Block & Leviton, LLP
contact info
Jonathan Gardner
Labaton Keller Sucharow LLP
contact info
James Christie
Labaton Keller Sucharow LLP
contact info
Michael Wernke
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Jacob Walker
Block & Leviton, LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Block
Block & Leviton, LLP
contact info
Michael J. Custer
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden
contact info
Joseph C. Barsalona II
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
contact info
Jeremy A. Lieberman
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Michael Rogers
Labaton Keller Sucharow LLP
contact info
Michael Canty
Labaton Keller Sucharow LLP
contact info
Michael Gaines
Block & Leviton, LLP
contact info
Brian Calandra
Pomerantz, LLP
contact info
Jacqueline Meyers
Labaton Keller Sucharow LLP
contact info
Creditor
AREA 4141 INVESTOR, LLC, AREA 4141 SPONSOR, LLC, and AREA MANAGER, LLC,
Represented By
Frank A. Oswald
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
contact info
Frederick Brian Rosner
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Creditor
Empire Southwest, LLC
Represented By
Tobey M. Daluz
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Margaret A. Vesper
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Arizona Public Service Company
Represented By
William F. Taylor, Jr
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLC
contact info
John M. Craig
Law Firm Of Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
U.S. Bank Trust Company, National Association, as Paying Agent and Indenture Trustee with respect to certain Toggle Convertible Notes due on May 31, 2026
DORSEY & WHITNEY (DELAWARE) LLP 300 Delaware Avenue Suite 1010
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Michael A. Rosow
Maslon LLP
contact info
Eric Lopez Schnabel
Dorsey & Whitney (delaware) LLP
contact info
Alessandra Glorioso
Dorsey & Whitney (delaware) LLP
contact info
Creditor
Salt River Project
Represented By
William F. Taylor, Jr
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLC
contact info
John M. Craig
Law Firm Of Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
STORE Master Funding XXXII, LLC
Represented By
Nicholas J. Brannick
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Michael S. Myers
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Craig Solomon Ganz
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Robert Bosch LLC
Represented By
Matthew C. Ziegler
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Sheryl L. Toby
Dykema Gossett PLLC
contact info
Michael Morgan
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
John C. Goodchild, III
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Jody C. Barillare
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Lorenzo Marinuzzi
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Siena Cerra
Morris James LLP
contact info
Doug Mannal
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Raff Ferraioli
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Eric J. Monzo
Morris James LLP
contact info
Theresa A. Foudy
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Brya Michele Keilson
Morris James LLP
contact info
Benjamin Wiley Butterfield
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Interested Party
Philipp Brothers Fertilizer LLC
Represented By
Natasha M. Songonuga
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Harrison H.D. Breakstone
Archer & Greiner, P.C
contact info
Interested Party
Lucid USA II, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher M. Dressel
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Jennifer Madden
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Jacqueline Michelle Dakin
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Joseph O. Larkin
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Destiny N. Almogue
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Ron E. Meisler
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Mann + Hummel USA, Inc.
Represented By
R. Grant Dick, IV
Cooch And Taylor, P.A.
contact info
Nora McGuffey
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Kevin Levitsky
Cooch And Taylor, P.A.
contact info
John A Simon
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Midwest Infrastructure Partners LLC
Represented By
Rachel Kubanda
Kean Miller LLP
contact info
Lloyd A. Lim
Kean Miller LLP
contact info
Monique Bair DiSabatino
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Trevor Milton
Represented By
Michael G. Busenkell
Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Nel ASA
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Schlerf
Stinson LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Global Water - Santa Cruz Water Company, Inc.
Represented By
Kate R. Buck
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Kelly Singer
Squire Patton Boggs (us) LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Plug Power, Inc.
Represented By
James P Muenker
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Matthew Steven Sarna
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Interested Party
Progresswerk Oberkirch AG
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Alta Equipment Group
Represented By
Kimberly Ross Clayson
Taft Stettinius & Hollister, LLP
contact info
Ashly Riches
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Bayard P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
U.S. Department of Justice 1100 L St NW
Washington, DC 20005
Represented By
Victor S Leung
Doj-Civ
contact info
Interested Party
Dassault Systemes Americas Corp.
Represented By
Eric R. Blythe
Mintz, Levin,cohn,ferris,glovsky
contact info
Zhao Liu
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Global Water - Palo Verde Utilities Company, Inc.
Represented By
Kate R. Buck
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Kelly Singer
Squire Patton Boggs (us) LLP
contact info
Interested Party
MGFH2 LLC
Represented By
William A. Hazeltine
Sullivan Hazeltine Allinson LLC
contact info
William D. Sullivan
Sullivan Hazeltine Allinson LLC
contact info
Christopher A. Bailey
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Tye C. Hancock
Holland & Knight LLC
contact info
Interested Party
NORMA Michigan Inc.
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
U.S. Bank Trust Company, National Association, as Paying Agent and Indenture Trustee with respect to certain Toggle Convertible Notes due on May 31, 2026
Represented By
Jason M Reed
Maslon LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Air Water America Inc.
Represented By
Scott B. Kitei
Honigman Miller Schwartz And Cohn LLP
contact info
Derek C. Abbott
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Luke Brzozowski
Morris Nichols Arsht And Tunnell
contact info
Matthew O Talmo
Morris, Nichols Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Performance Court QOZB, LLC
Represented By
Timothy M. Swanson
Frost Brown Todd LLP
contact info
Timothy Swanson
Frost Brown Todd LLP
contact info
Susan E. Kaufman
Law Office Of Susan E. Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Taylor-Wharton America Inc.
Represented By
Scott B. Kitei
Honigman Miller Schwartz And Cohn LLP
contact info
Derek C. Abbott
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Luke Brzozowski
Morris Nichols Arsht And Tunnell
contact info
Matthew O Talmo
Morris, Nichols Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Altair Engineering, Inc.
Represented By
Eric S Chafetz
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Curtis S. Miller
Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Carolyn Gauvin
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Mitsubishi HC Capital America, Inc. (successor by merger to Engs Commercial Finance Co.)
Represented By
Matthew P. Ward
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Brian R. Trumbauer
Bodman LLP
contact info
Robert J. Diehl, Jr.
Bodman LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Cleveland Brothers Equipment Company, Inc.
Represented By
William A. Hazeltine
Sullivan Hazeltine Allinson LLC
contact info
William D. Sullivan
Sullivan Hazeltine Allinson LLC
contact info
Elizabeth M. Smith
Mcnees Wallace & Nurick LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Core Molding Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Kate R. Buck
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Methode Electronics, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew E. Wilkins
Brooks Wilkins Sharkey & Turco PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lead Class Plaintiff
Represented By
Joseph C. Barsalona II
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
contact info
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Timothy Jay Fox, Jr.
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Cred. Comm. Chair
STORE Master Funding XXXII, LLC
Terminated: 04/23/2025
8377 E. Hartford Drive Suite 100
Scottsdale, AZ 85255


1. EV maker Nikola files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy protection (foxbusiness.com)
Submitted Thu 02/20/2025
Docket last updated: 20 minutes ago
Sunday, May 04, 2025
478 478 claims Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/04 6:31 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Amy Henault . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 383 ,384 ,385 ,386 ,387 ,388
Friday, May 02, 2025
477 477 claims Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/02 6:34 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Claims Agent . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 451 ,452 ,454 ,455 ,456 ,457 ,459
476 476 answer Objection Fri 05/02 12:25 PM
Limited Objection and Reservation of Rights with Respect to Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Approving Rejection of Certain Agreements Effective as of the Petition Date Related [+] Filed by Air Liquide Hydrogen Energy U.S. LLC (Murley, Lucian)
Related: [-] 428
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 01, 2025
475 475 motion File Under Seal - Motion (B) Thu 05/01 3:15 PM
Motion to File Under Seal // Debtors' Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit D to the Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Agency Agreement with Gordon Brothers Commercial & Industrial LLC; (II) Authorizing the Sale of Certain Remaining Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Interest, and Encumbrances; and (III) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Nikola Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/9/2025. (Kotsiras, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
474 474 notice Proposed Redacted Document Thu 05/01 1:38 PM
(REDACTED) // Notice of Filing of Redacted Version of Exhibit D to the Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Agency Agreement with Gordon Brothers Commercial & Industrial LLC; (II) Authorizing the Sale of Certain Remaining Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Interests, and Encumbrances; and (III) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Nikola Corporation. (Kotsiras, Maria)
Related: [-] 451
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
473 473 4 pgs order Order Thu 05/01 9:22 AM
Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes and Fees, (II) Authorizing the Debtors' Banks to Honor All Related Payment Requests, and (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 5/1/2025. (DRG)
Related: [-] 190 ,471
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
472 472 3 pgs notice Appearance - Notice Wed 04/30 6:38 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by PACCAR Inc. (Cosman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
471 471 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Wed 04/30 5:05 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Amended Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes and Fees, (II) Authorizing the Debtors' Banks to Honor All Related Payment Requests, and (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Nikola Corporation. (Forshay, Shannon)
Related: [-] 9 ,190
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
misc Add Attorney Wed 04/30 6:54 PM
Attorney Rebecca Marston and Bradley A. Cosman for PACCAR Inc added to case Filed by PACCAR Inc. (Cosman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
470 470 misc List of Ordinary Course Professionals Tue 04/29 7:08 PM
Supplemental List of Ordinary Course Professionals //Notice of Filing of Second Supplemental Ordinary Course Professional List Related [+] Filed by Nikola Corporation. (Kotsiras, Maria)
Related: [-] 195 ,373
Att: 1 Exhibit A
469 469 claims Certificate of Mailing Tue 04/29 1:57 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Amy Henault . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 352
468 468 4 pgs notice Hearing - Notice Tue 04/29 11:34 AM
Notice of Hearing Regarding Debtors' Expedited Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Immediately Employ and Retain STX Commodities, LLC as Commodities Broker and to Enter Into the Letter Agreement, (II) Approving Bidding Procedures for the Sale of the Environmental Credits, (III) Authorizing the Debtors to Designate Paccar Inc. as the Stalking Horse Bidder and Provide Bid Protections, (IV) Approving the Sale of the Environmental Credits Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Interests, and Encumbrances; and (V) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Nikola Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 5/9/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Kotsiras, Maria)
Related: [-] 454 ,467
467 467 order Shorten Time Tue 04/29 11:09 AM
Order Shortening the Notice with Respect to the Debtors' Expedited Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Immediately Employ and Retain STX Commodities, LLC as Commodities Broker and to Enter Into the Letter Agreement, (II) Approving Bidding Procedures for the Sale of the Environmental Credits, (III) Authorizing the Debtors to Designate Paccar Inc. as the Stalking Horse Bidder and Provide Bid Protections, (IV) Approving the Sale of the Environmental Credits Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Interests, and Encumbrances; and (V) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 4/29/2025. (AMH)
Related: [-] 456 ,465
466 466 notice Hearing - Notice Tue 04/29 10:22 AM
Amended Notice of Hearing Regarding Debtors' Fifth Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Reject Certain Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property and Executory Contracts; (II) Abandon any Remaining Personal Property Located at the Leased Premises; and (III) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Nikola Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/9/2025. (Kotsiras, Maria)
Related: [-] 457
Monday, April 28, 2025
465 465 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Mon 04/28 8:19 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Shortening the Notice with Respect to the Debtors' Expedited Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Immediately Employ and Retain STX Commodities, LLC as Commodities Broker and to Enter Into the Letter Agreement, (II) Approving Bidding Procedures for the Sale of the Environmental Credits, (III) Authorizing the Debtors to Designate Paccar Inc. as the Stalking Horse Bidder and Provide Bid Protections, (IV) Approving the Sale of the Environmental Credits Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Interests, and Encumbrances; and (V) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Nikola Corporation. (Kotsiras, Maria)
Related: [-] 456
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
464 464 notice Administrative Claims Bar Date - Notice Mon 04/28 4:31 PM
Notice of Administrative Claims Bar Date. The deadline for filing Administrative Claims is June 2, 2025 at 5:00 p.m. (ET). Filed by Nikola Corporation. (Kotsiras, Maria)
Related: [-]
463 463 3 pgs notice Hearing - Notice Mon 04/28 2:21 PM
Notice of Hearing Regarding Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Agency Agreement with Gordon Brothers Commercial & Industrial LLC; (II) Authorizing the Sale of Certain Remaining Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Interests, and Encumbrances; and (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Nikola Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/9/2025. (Kotsiras, Maria)
Related: [-] 451 ,462
462 462 order Shorten Time Mon 04/28 1:46 PM
Order Shortening the Notice With Respect to Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Agency Agreement with Gordon Brothers Commercial & Industrial LLC; (II) Authorizing the Sale of Certain Remaining Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Interests, and Encumbrances; and (III) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 4/28/2025. (DRG)
Related: [-] 452
461 461 misc Exhibit Mon 04/28 12:04 PM
Exhibit(s) // Notice of Certain Sale Closings Related [+] Filed by Nikola Corporation. (Kotsiras, Maria)
Related: [-] 404 ,407 ,408
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Sunday, April 27, 2025
460 460 crditcrd none Sun 04/27 10:50 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens([LINK 25-10258 TMH] ) [motion,msell] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A12146075, amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]