Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Maureen P Kelly
Case #: 2:25-cv-00232
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2025
Terminated:Mar 28, 2025
Case in other court:MDL, 3140
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 6:43 AM EDT
Defendant
Greenstone LLC
2898 Manufacturers Road Office #112
Greensboro, NC 27406
Defendant
PFIZER, INC.
66 Hudson Boulevard East
New York, NY 10001
Defendant
PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC
7171 Portage Road
Kalamazoo, MI 49002
Defendant
PHARMACIA LLC
1340 Smith Avenue Suite A
Baltimore, MD 21209
Defendant
PRASCO LLC
6125 Commerce Court
Mason, OH 45050
Defendant
VIATRIS INC
1000 Mylan Boulevard
Canonsburg, PA 15317
Plaintiff
LARITA TURNER
317 Arabella Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15210
Represented By
Laura Elizabeth Balzarini
Balzarini & Watson
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
10 10 utility Remark Mon 03/31 11:22 AM
DETAILS: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Western has been opened in Northern District of Florida as case 3:25-cv-00435, filed 03/28/2025. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Fri 03/28 10:32 AM
Case electronically transferred to District of Northern District of Florida. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
9 9 transfer Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Thu 03/27 3:50 PM
Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Northern District of Florida. (sdp)
Related: [-]
8 8 transfer Conditional Transfer Order Thu 03/27 3:45 PM
Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
misc QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply) Fri 02/21 10:39 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re4 Praecipe to Issue Summons,5 Praecipe to Issue Summons,6 Praecipe to Issue Summons,7 Praecipe to Issue Summons,3 Praecipe to Issue Summons,2 Praecipe to Issue Summons. ERROR: no praecipe attached. CORRECTION: only one praecipe needed and attach all summons to one praecipe. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
7 7 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Thu 02/20 10:45 AM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by LARITA TURNER (Balzarini, Laura)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Thu 02/20 10:44 AM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by LARITA TURNER (Balzarini, Laura)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Thu 02/20 10:42 AM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by LARITA TURNER (Balzarini, Laura)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Thu 02/20 10:40 AM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by LARITA TURNER (Balzarini, Laura)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Thu 02/20 10:38 AM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by LARITA TURNER (Balzarini, Laura)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Thu 02/20 10:37 AM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by LARITA TURNER (Balzarini, Laura)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
1 1 60 pgs cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Wed 02/19 12:23 PM
COMPLAINT against PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PRASCO LLC, GREENSTONE, LLC and VIATRIS, NC. (Fee $405, Receipt #APAWDC-8707611), filed by Larita Turner. (Balzarini, Laura) Modified text on 2/19/2025 to add receipt number. (jkn) Modified text on 2/19/2025 to add defendants names. (jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 02/19 3:16 PM
Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly added. (jd)
Related: [-]