Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:25-bk-10220

Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Nancy V Alquist
Case #: 1:25-ap-00048
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
NCR Towing and Recovery LLC
1723 Marley Ave.
Glen Burnie, MD 21060
Represented By
NCR Towing and Recovery LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Zvi Guttman
P.O. Box 32308
Baltimore, MD 21282
Represented By
Zvi Guttman
The Law Offices Of Zvi Guttman, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/28 3:44 PM
Motion To Show Cause Why NCR Towing and Recovery LLC Should Not Be Held In Contempt For Failure To Comply With Order Granting Motion For Turnover and Related Relief Filed by Zvi Guttman. (Guttman, Zvi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
court Returned Mail (Auto-Docket) Mon 04/28 10:11 AM
Returned Mail: mail sent via USPS was returned as undeliverable for the following: Mailed on 04/13/2025 a notice RE: Order on Motion for Turnover of Property TO NCR TOWING AND RECOVERY LLC CHRISTINA MITCHELL, Resident Agent 552 DEFENSE HWY ANNAPOLIS MD 21401. (admin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 13, 2025
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket) Mon 04/14 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion for Turnover of Property
Friday, April 11, 2025
13 13 order Turnover of Property Fri 04/11 10:13 AM
Order Granting Motion Turnover and Related Relief. As amended. No Timely Opposition Related [+]. (Adu-Bakare, Busayo)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Turnover of Property filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman
Friday, April 04, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK (Auto-Docket) Sat 04/05 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Defendant NCR Towing and Recovery LLC
11 11 court Deficiency Notice Fri 04/04 12:50 PM
Deficiency Notice (missing affidavit of non-military) Related [+]. Cured Pleading due by 4/18/2025. (Adu-Bakare, Busayo)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman
Thursday, April 03, 2025
10 10 motion Default Judgment Thu 04/03 8:50 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Zvi Guttman Related [+]. (Guttman, Zvi)
Related: [-] 9 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Defendant NCR Towing and Recovery LLC
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
9 9 court Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 04/02 8:48 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant NCR Towing and Recovery LLC Related [+]. (Adu-Bakare, Busayo)
Related: [-] 5 Affidavit of Summons Service Executed
Monday, March 31, 2025
8 8 apmisc Request Mon 03/31 1:18 PM
Request for on behalf of Zvi Guttman Trustee, Plaintiff, for Entry of Default Filed by Zvi Guttman Related [+]. (Guttman, Zvi)
Related: [-] 5 Affidavit of Summons Service Executed
Friday, February 28, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP (Auto-Docket) Sat 03/01 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 02/28/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
6 6 motion Turnover of Property Wed 02/26 2:58 PM
Motion for Turnover of Property and Related Relief as to 2019 International LT625 - VIN: 3HSDZTZR0KN339367 Filed by Zvi Guttman. (Guttman, Zvi) Modified on 2/27/2025 text enhanced to include vehicle information (Alexander, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 cmp Affidavit of Summons Service Wed 02/26 2:56 PM
Affidavit of Summons Service Executed on NCR Towing and Recovery LLC 2/26/2025 . (Guttman, Zvi)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued Wed 02/26 6:41 AM
Summons Issued on NCR Towing and Recovery LLC Date Issued 2/26/2025, Answer Due 3/28/2025 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/7/2025 at 02:00 PM. Virtual hearing - For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Arter, Laurie)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman
Friday, February 21, 2025
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/21 11:31 AM
Amended Complaint by Zvi Guttman on behalf of Zvi Guttman against NCR Towing and Recovery LLC. Related [+]. (Guttman, Zvi)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
2 2 apmisc Line Fri 02/21 11:29 AM
Line Submitting Amended Complaint Filed by Zvi Guttman Related [+]. (Guttman, Zvi)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman
Att: 1 Exhibit Clean Amended Complaint
Att: 2 Exhibit Red Line Amended Complaint
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Amended Complaint
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint (Case Opening) Tue 02/18 7:10 PM
Adversary case 25-00048 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Complaint by Zvi Guttman on behalf of Zvi Guttman against NCR Towing and Recovery LLC. The filing fee is DEFERRED - Plaintiff is the Trustee in the Bankruptcy case and will pay the fee to the extent that there is an estate. (Guttman, Zvi)
Related: [-]