California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 2:25-cv-01383
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 3:34 AM PDT
Defendant
Edison International
Represented By
Lorraine Lolita Abdulahad
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W. Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pedro J. Pizarro
Represented By
Lorraine Lolita Abdulahad
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W. Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Maria Rigatti
Represented By
Lorraine Lolita Abdulahad
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W. Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Douglas Elliott
Represented By
Laurence M. Rosen
Rosen Law Firm PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
27 27 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 04/21 11:14 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by lead plaintiff movants Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Profit Sharing Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, (Dolitsky, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Declaration (Motion related) Mon 04/21 11:12 PM
DECLARATION of Kenneth P. Dolitsky in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff 24 filed by Movants Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Profit Sharing Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund.(Dolitsky, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Certifications,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Estimate of Losses
25 25 9 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 04/21 11:11 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff 24 filed by Movants Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Profit Sharing Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund. (Dolitsky, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Appointment of Counsel Mon 04/21 11:10 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by lead plaintiff movants Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Profit Sharing Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund. Motion set for hearing on 5/30/2025 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Dolitsky, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 04/21 11:07 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kenneth P. Dolitsky counsel for Movants Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Profit Sharing Fund. Adding Kenneth P. Dolitsky as counsel of record for Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Profit Sharing Fund for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by lead plaintiff movants Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Profit Sharing Fund. (Attorney Kenneth P. Dolitsky added to party Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund(pty:mov), Attorney Kenneth P. Dolitsky added to party Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund(pty:mov), Attorney Kenneth P. Dolitsky added to party Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Profit Sharing Fund(pty:mov))(Dolitsky, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 04/21 7:03 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Movant Lee Sanders, (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
21 21 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 04/21 7:01 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff 20 filed by Movant Lee Sanders. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Appointment of Counsel Mon 04/21 7:00 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff filed by Movant Lee Sanders. Motion set for hearing on 5/30/2025 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attorney Laurence M. Rosen added to party Lee Sanders(pty:mov)) (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Laurence M. Rosen,
Att: 2 Exhibit to Rosen Decl 1 - PSLRA Early Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit to Rosen Decl 2 - PSLRA Cert,
Att: 4 Exhibit to Rosen Decl 3 - Loss Chart,
Att: 5 Exhibit to Rosen Decl 4 - Rosen Law Firm Resume,
Att: 6 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order Extending Answer Due Deadline Wed 04/09 9:59 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Having reviewed the parties' Stipulation18 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendants shall not be required to answer or otherwise respond to the Initial Complaint until after the Court has appointed the lead plaintiff and lead counsel and set a schedule for filing any amended complaint and any motion to dismiss thereto. Upon appointing the lead plaintiff and lead counsel, the Court will set: (1) a deadline for the filing of a first amended complaint or designation of an operative complaint; and (2) a deadline and briefing schedule, if needed, for Defendants' response to the complaint. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
18 18 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Thu 03/27 1:42 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Edison International, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti.(Gildersleeve, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
17 17 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 03/11 6:35 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),,15 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),,14 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),,13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
16 16 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/10 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Edison International, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti, (Gildersleeve, John)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 03/10 4:10 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lorraine Lolita Abdulahad counsel for Defendants Edison International, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti. Adding Lorraine L. Abdulahad as counsel of record for Edison International, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Edison International, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti. (Attorney Lorraine Lolita Abdulahad added to party Edison International(pty:dft), Attorney Lorraine Lolita Abdulahad added to party Pedro J. Pizarro(pty:dft), Attorney Lorraine Lolita Abdulahad added to party Maria Rigatti(pty:dft))(Abdulahad, Lorraine)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 03/10 4:05 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John W. Spiegel counsel for Defendants Edison International, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti. Adding John W. Spiegel as counsel of record for Edison International, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Edison International, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti. (Attorney John W. Spiegel added to party Edison International(pty:dft), Attorney John W. Spiegel added to party Pedro J. Pizarro(pty:dft), Attorney John W. Spiegel added to party Maria Rigatti(pty:dft))(Spiegel, John)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 03/10 3:59 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John Michael Gildersleeve counsel for Defendants Edison International, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti. Adding John M. Gildersleeve as counsel of record for Edison International, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Edison International, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti. (Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Edison International(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Pedro J. Pizarro(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Maria Rigatti(pty:dft))(Gildersleeve, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 03/05 7:52 AM
Standing Order upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (lfa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
11 11 order Transferring Case (Related Case)(CV-34) Tue 03/04 4:08 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:25-cv-01154 SB(DFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo and Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:25-cv-01383 SB(DFMx). Signed by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/25 6:45 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Douglas Elliott. upon Edison International waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/20/2025, answer due 4/21/2025; Pedro J. Pizarro waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/20/2025, answer due 4/21/2025; Maria Rigatti waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/20/2025, answer due 4/21/2025. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve (counsel).(Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waiver for Pedro J. Pizarro,
Att: 2 Waiver for Maria Rigatti
Thursday, February 20, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 02/20 11:09 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Edison International, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 02/20 10:57 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 02/20 10:57 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 02/20 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
5 5 notice Related Case(s) Wed 02/19 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Douglas Elliott. Related Case(s): 2:25-cv-01154 (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 02/19 10:33 AM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Douglas Elliott, (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs notice Summons Request Wed 02/19 10:28 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Douglas Elliott. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 02/19 10:26 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Douglas Elliott. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/19 10:23 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39130342 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Douglas Elliott. (Attorney Laurence M. Rosen added to party Douglas Elliott(pty:pla))(Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit PSLRA Certification