Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Kristine G Baker
Referred: Edie R Ervin
Case #: 2:25-cv-00033
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Defendant
Doe
Plaintiff
Oscar Antonio Bello-Pachay

GPO Apr 25 2025
ORDER allowing Mr. Bello-Pachay up to and including 5/9/2025 to file a reply addressing the arguments in Respondent's response; and directing the Clerk of the Court to change respondent to "Warden, FCI-Forrest City". Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 4/25/2025. (jak)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/14 2:22 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to6 Response to Habeas Petition, by Oscar Antonio Bello-Pachay. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/05 3:26 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting8 Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner's reply is due Friday, May 16, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 05/05/25. (dmm)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/05 11:10 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply by Oscar Antonio Bello-Pachay. (ajj)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/25 9:21 AM
ORDER allowing Mr. Bello-Pachay up to and including 5/9/2025 to file a reply addressing the arguments in Respondent's response; and directing the Clerk of the Court to change respondent to "Warden, FCI-Forrest City". Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 4/25/2025. (jak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
6 6 answer Response to Habeas Petition Thu 04/24 12:39 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Francene Helaire.(Webster, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Respondent's Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Respondent's Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Respondent's Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Respondent's Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Respondent's Exhibit 5
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/24 8:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Dennis Webster on behalf of Francene Helaire (Webster, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order Directing Service (State Habeas) Wed 04/02 4:09 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of1 2241 petition and this order on Respondent and the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Arkansas; directing Respondent to file a responsive pleading within 21 days of service; and directing the Clerk of the Court to change the Respondent to "Francene Helaire, Acting Warden, FCI-Forrest City". Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 04/02/2025. (llg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
3 3 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 03/24 2:41 PM
Filing Fee Received. Amount: $5.00, Receipt # JON396. (jak)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
2 2 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/03 10:29 AM
ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to send Mr. Bello-Pachay an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit, along with this Order; directing Mr. Bello-Pachay to either file the completed Application or pay the $5.00 filing fee, in full, on or before Monday, 03/24/2025, if he wishes to continue with this habeas action; and directing the Clerk to change Respondent to "Craig Stalhood, Acting Warden, FCI-Forrest City." Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 03/03/2025. (llg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 02/19 8:06 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Oscar Antonio Bello-Pachay. Filing fee $5 paid, LIT9572.(cmn)
Related: [-]