Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Susan O Hickey
Case #: 6:25-cv-06022
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
11 11 misc Response Fri 04/04 12:47 PM
RESPONSE by Corey M. Turner re8 Order.(mll)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
10 10 misc Mail Returned Fri 03/28 1:33 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. Mail originally sent to Corey M. Turner at 406 S 5th St, Arkadelphia, AR 71923 including Clerk's Order of Judge Assignment and6 Notice of Consent/Reassignment filed by Corey M. Turner. Resent to ADC - Ouachita River Unit. (tmc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
9 9 misc Mail Returned Thu 03/27 3:35 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Not Deliverable as addressed. Mail originally sent to Corey Turner at Clark County Jail including5 Response filed by Corey M. Turner. Resent to ADC - OUACHITA RIVER UNIT. (mjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/18 11:22 AM
ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to advise the court (1) why he does not believe each of the cases listed above constitutes a strike within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g); or (2) why he does not believe the three strikes rule applies to this case. The deadline for Plaintiff to do so is April 8, 2025. Plaintiff is advised that failure to comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal of this case. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on March 18, 2025. (mbm)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 03/18 11:26 AM
Document due in Response to Order8 by 4/8/2025. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on March 18, 2025. (mbm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 03/12 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Corey Turner. There are no documents to resend. (tmc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Consent/Reassignment Fri 03/07 4:02 PM
REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT to a District Judge for entry of the final judgment or order by Corey M. Turner. (mjm)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Order of Judge Assignment Fri 03/07 4:05 PM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable Susan O. Hickey and Honorable Mark E. Ford, as the referral judge. (mjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
5 5 misc Response Fri 02/28 3:28 PM
RESPONSE by Corey M. Turner re3 Order Provisionally Filing Complaint.(mll) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/28/2025) (mll)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
4 4 notice Magistrate Direct Assignment Notice PR Wed 02/19 1:32 PM
NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE directed to Plaintiff. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must return the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within twenty-one (21) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 3/12/2025. (mbm)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Provisionally Filing Complaint Wed 02/19 1:27 PM
ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: (1) why Plaintiff does not believe each of the cases listed in the order constitutes a strike within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g); or (2) why Plaintiff does not believe the three strikes rule applies to this case. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Additional information due by 3/17/2025. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on February 19, 2025. (mbm)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) Service Wed 02/19 1:14 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983), MOTION for Service by Corey M. Turner. (mbm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (42:1983) Wed 02/19 12:47 PM
COMPLAINT (42:1983) against Jason Watson, Brian Wingfield, filed by Corey M. Turner.(mbm) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/19/2025) (mbm)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/19 1:08 PM
Case Presiding Judge Reassigned to Honorable Mark E. Ford. Honorable Susan O. Hickey no longer assigned to the case. (bjb)
Related: [-]