Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Abbie Crites-Leoni
Case #: 4:25-cv-00201
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2025
Case in other court:St. Louis County Circuit Court, 25sl-cc00368
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 5:55 AM CDT
Defendant
Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By
Slater Felzien
Lashly And Baer PC
contact info
Patrick E. Foppe
Lashly And Baer PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tracy Ballard
Represented By
Alexander Abraham Wolff
Goldblatt Singer PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
16 16 minutes Status Conference Fri 05/02 3:11 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni: Status Conference held on 5/2/2025. (proceedings started: 1:30) (proceedings ended: 1:37) (Appearance for Plaintiff: Alex Wolff)(Appearance for Defendant: Slater Felzien) (MRS)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Fri 05/02 2:39 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw as Plaintiff's Counsel filed by Alexander A. Wolff and Goldblatt + Singer (Doc. 15) is held in abeyance until June 16, 2025. If no entry of appearance is filed by that time, the Court will assume Plaintiff is proceeding pro se. Response to Court due by 6/16/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 5/2/2025. (JMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
14 14 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/28 10:43 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 5/2/2025 01:30 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 4/28/2025. (SBS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
13 13 motion Withdraw as Attorney/Firm Thu 04/17 3:27 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re attorney/firm Alexander A. Wolff / Goldblatt + Singer by Plaintiff Tracy Ballard.(Wolff, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, February 21, 2025
12 12 misc Full Consent to a Magistrate Fri 02/21 1:11 PM
FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Tracy Ballard, Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (ANR)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 02/21 11:58 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Slater Felzien for Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Felzien, Slater)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 02/21 9:32 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tracy Ballard. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Wolff, Alexander)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 02/21 9:31 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Alexander Abraham Wolff for Plaintiff Tracy Ballard. (Wolff, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
8 8 cmp Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY Wed 02/19 3:47 PM
Petition Related [+] Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Tracy Ballard.(JWD)
Related: [-] moval/Transfer
7 7 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Wed 02/19 3:28 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL Exhibit 1 - State Court File by Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Foppe, Patrick)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs misc Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT) Wed 02/19 1:08 PM
MEMORANDUM re1 Notice of Removal Petition, Original Filing Form by Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Foppe, Patrick)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/19 12:53 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc..(Foppe, Patrick)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Entry of Appearance Wed 02/19 12:49 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick E. Foppe for Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Foppe, Patrick)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Wed 02/19 12:47 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Dollar Tree, Inc... (Foppe, Patrick)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Wed 02/19 12:42 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Foppe, Patrick)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Petition Wed 02/19 12:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 25sl-cc00368, with receipt number AMOEDC-11096239, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc..(Foppe, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
misc Case Opening Notification Wed 02/19 3:49 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD)
Related: [-]