South Dakota District Court
Judge:Camela C Theeler
Case #: 4:25-cv-04024
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 5:47 AM CDT
Defendant
Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation
Defendant
Halliday, Watkins, Mann, PC
Represented By
Zachary Nesbit
Halliday, Watkins & Mann
contact info
Jason B Tingle
Halliday, Watkins, & Mann, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Gerald M Hunter
565 W. Myrtle Suite 100
Boise, ID 83708
Represented By
Zachary Nesbit
Halliday, Watkins & Mann
contact info
Jason B Tingle
Halliday, Watkins, & Mann, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Idaho Housing and Finance Association
Represented By
Zachary Nesbit
Halliday, Watkins & Mann
contact info
Jason B Tingle
Halliday, Watkins, & Mann, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
MERSCORP Holdings, Inc.
Defendant
Amber Maricio
Represented By
Thomas M. Frankman
Davenport, Evans, Hurwitz & Smith
contact info
Zachary Nesbit
Halliday, Watkins & Mann
contact info
Ashley R. Brost
Davenport, Evans, Hurwitz & Smith, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (MERS)
Defendant
Gary Ross
Represented By
Zachary Nesbit
Halliday, Watkins & Mann
contact info
Jason B Tingle
Halliday, Watkins, & Mann, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Stacie Ruffing
609 Bitterroot Dr.
Boise, ID 83709
Represented By
Zachary Nesbit
Halliday, Watkins & Mann
contact info
Jason B Tingle
Halliday, Watkins, & Mann, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Stewart Title Company
6216 S. Pinnacle Pl. Suite 102
Sioux Falls, SD 57108
Represented By
Stephen C. Landon
Cadwell Sanford Deibert & Garry, LLP
contact info
Brian Michael Sund
Morrison Sund PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Jason B Tingle
376 East 400 South Suite 300
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Zachary Nesbit
Halliday, Watkins & Mann
contact info
Jason B Tingle
Halliday, Watkins, & Mann, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Douglas E. Anderson
2208 S. Braemar Dr.
Sioux Falls, SD 57105


Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
73 73 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/24 3:56 PM
MOTION for Judicial Accounting and Disclosure of Securitized Financial Instruments by Douglas E. Anderson. (DJP)
Related: [-]
72 72 misc Declaration Thu 04/24 3:54 PM
DECLARATION of Douglas E. Anderson re71 MOTION to Invoke Exclusive Equity Jurisdiction. (DJP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 attachment
71 71 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/24 3:47 PM
MOTION to Invoke Exclusive Equity Jurisdiction by Douglas E. Anderson. (DJP)
Related: [-]
70 70 notice Notice Thu 04/24 3:42 PM
NOTICE To Court of Record Preservation by Douglas E. Anderson. (DJP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
69 69 motion Compel Tue 04/22 4:03 PM
MOTION to COMPEL entry of default, notice of clerk misconduct, and demand for sanctions for obstruction of justice, constitutional violations, and complicity in RICO enterprise by Douglas E. Anderson. (DJP)
Related: [-]
68 68 notice Notice Tue 04/22 3:49 PM
DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE of SEC-Filed Exhibits and Securitized Financial Instruments by Douglas E. Anderson (DJP)
Related: [-]
67 67 motion Compel Tue 04/22 3:47 PM
MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Securities Filings and Corporate Records by Douglas E. Anderson. (DJP)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
66 66 motion Compel Mon 04/21 4:02 PM
MOTION to Compel Entry of Default, Notice of Clerk Misconduct, and Demand for Sanctions for Obstruction of Justice by Douglas E. Anderson. (DJP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
65 65 motion Compel Mon 04/21 3:59 PM
MOTION to Compel Entry of Default, Charges of Collusion, Treason and Criminal Obstruction of Justice by Douglas E. Anderson. (DJP)
Related: [-]
64 64 notice Notice Mon 04/21 10:54 AM
Judicial NOTICE to enter Plaintiff's EXH's on the record by Douglas E. Anderson.(DJP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
63 63 notice Notice Mon 04/21 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Treason by Douglas E. Anderson. (DJP)
Related: [-]
62 62 notice Notice Mon 04/21 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Writ of Habeas Corpus by Douglas E. Anderson.(DJP)
Related: [-]
61 61 order Clerks Denial of Default Mon 04/21 9:56 AM
Clerk's DENIAL of Default as to Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation. (MWT)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
60 60 motion Entry of Default Fri 04/18 3:44 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default against Fairway Independent Mortgage Corp. and Non-Appearing Defendant by Douglas E. Anderson. (DJP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 attachments
59 59 motion Compel Fri 04/18 3:42 PM
Supplemental NOTICE and MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Securitized Title Interests and Liability of STGC by Douglas E. Anderson. (DJP)
Related: [-]
58 58 notice Notice Fri 04/18 3:35 PM
NOTICE of filing - SEC Corporate Structure & Liability Disclosure by Douglas E. Anderson. (DJP)
Related: [-]
57 57 motion Sanctions Fri 04/18 3:33 PM
MOTION for Sanctions against attorney Steve Landon by Douglas E. Anderson. (DJP)
Related: [-]
56 56 motion Strike Fri 04/18 3:29 PM
OBJECTION to untimely "nunc pro tunc" filing, MOTION to Strike Improper Party Substitution, and NOTICE of exclusive fiduciary authority by Douglas E. Anderson. (DJP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachments
55 55 notice Notice Fri 04/18 3:23 PM
NOTICE to the Securities and Exchange Commission by Douglas E. Anderson.(DJP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachments
54 54 notice Notice Fri 04/18 3:21 PM
Judicial NOTICE to enter Plaintiff's EXH's on the Record by Douglas E. Anderson. (DJP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
53 53 notice Notice Thu 04/17 12:28 PM
Judicial NOTICE to enter Plaintiff's exhibits on the record by Douglas E. Anderson.(DJP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
52 52 motion Strike Show Cause Compel Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/17 12:11 PM
MOTION to Strike filings made by Jason Tingle and to prohibit Tingle from submitting further filings as representative of any other defendant; MOTION for Order to Show Cause; MOTION to Compel all other named defendants to appear through independent counsel; MOTION to preserve Plaintiff's right to amend complaint by Douglas E. Anderson. (DJP)
Related: [-]
51 51 notice Notice Thu 04/17 12:00 PM
Judicial Notice of Fraud, Unauthorized Representation, Collusion, and Demand for Disclosure of Case Bond and Cusip Instruments by Douglas E. Anderson. (DJP)
Related: [-]
50 50 notice Notice Thu 04/17 11:47 AM
Judicial Notice to enter Plaintiff's EXH's on the Record by Douglas E. Anderson.(DJP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
49 49 motion Amend/Correct Thu 04/17 11:45 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct NAME NUNC PRO TUNC by Stewart Title Company. (Landon, Stephen)
Related: [-]
48 48 misc Pro Se Registration for Electronic Notice (COURT USE ONLY) Thu 04/17 11:39 AM
REGISTRATION for Electronic Notice by Douglas E. Anderson. Pro se party Douglas E. Anderson will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (DJP)
Related: [-]