Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mark X Mullin
Case #: 4:25-bk-40583
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2025

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Vision2Systems LLC
603 Munger Ave Ste 375
Dallas, TX 75202-1847
Represented By
Jason Patrick Kathman
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
109 109 order Employ Tue 05/13 3:36 PM
Order granting application to employ Spencer Fane LLP as Attorney Related [+] Entered on 5/13/2025. (Dozier, Bryan)
Related: [-] 17
Thursday, May 08, 2025
108 108 misc Certificate of no objection Thu 05/08 4:02 PM
Certificate of no objection filed by Debtor Vision2Systems LLC Related [+]. (Anderson, Alex)
Related: [-] 17 Application to employ Spencer Fane LLP as Attorney
107 107 order Protective order Thu 05/08 12:02 PM
Order granting motion for protective order Related [+] Entered on 5/8/2025. (Dozier, Bryan)
Related: [-] 15
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
106 106 order Examination Tue 05/06 3:51 PM
Agreed Order granting motion for 2004 examination Related [+] Entered on 5/6/2025. (Dozier, Bryan)
Related: [-] #49