Consolidated
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:25-cv-00140
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2025
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:25-cv-00324
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 6:15 AM EDT
Defendant
GREENSTONE LLC
Defendant
PFIZER INC
Defendant
PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC
Defendant
PHARMACIA LLC
Defendant
PRASCO LLC
Defendant
VIATRIS INC
Interested Party
JACOB WOODY
Plaintiff
CHRISTINA SCHERBENSKI
Represented By
Tara D Sutton
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
JULIE REYNOLDS
Robins Kaplan Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
RASHANDA C BRUCE
Robbins Kaplan Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
TARA SUTTON
Robins Kaplan Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
10 10 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 04/03 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record by CHRISTINA SCHERBENSKI (REYNOLDS, JULIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Withdrawal of Counsel of Record
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
6 6 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:25-cv-00324. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
5 5 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/19/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
4 4 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #3140 re:1 Complaint. (BTX) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/19/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons Issued as to Greenstone LLC, Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Co., LLC, Pharmacia LLC, Prasco, LLC, Viatris Inc. (BTX) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/19/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 24-cv-324 (NEB/ECW). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (BTX) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/19/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT against Greenstone LLC, Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Co., LLC, Pharmacia LLC, Prasco, LLC, Viatris Inc (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11634199) filed by Christina Scherbenski. Filer requests summons issued. (Sutton, Tara) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/19/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet