Alaska District Court
Judge:Sharon L Gleason
Case #: 3:25-cv-00038
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 3:01 AM AKDT
Defendant
Doug Burgum
Defendant
Howard W. Lutnick
Defendant
Donald J. Trump
Movant
American Petroleum Institute
Represented By
Cody Doig
Alaska Attorney General
contact info
Daniel Volchok
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Jason T Morgan
Stoel Rives Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Alaska Wilderness League
Represented By
Brettny E. Hardy
Earthjustice (ca)
contact info
Hannah Payne Foster
Earthjustice
contact info
George Torgun
Earthjustice
contact info
Erik Clifford Grafe
Earthjustice
contact info
Stephen Daniel Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Plaintiff
Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By
Brettny E. Hardy
Earthjustice (ca)
contact info
Hannah Payne Foster
Earthjustice
contact info
George Torgun
Earthjustice
contact info
Erik Clifford Grafe
Earthjustice
contact info
Stephen Daniel Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Plaintiff
Greenpeace, Inc.
Represented By
Brettny E. Hardy
Earthjustice (ca)
contact info
Hannah Payne Foster
Earthjustice
contact info
George Torgun
Earthjustice
contact info
Erik Clifford Grafe
Earthjustice
contact info
Stephen Daniel Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Plaintiff
Healthy Gulf
Represented By
Brettny E. Hardy
Earthjustice (ca)
contact info
Hannah Payne Foster
Earthjustice
contact info
George Torgun
Earthjustice
contact info
Erik Clifford Grafe
Earthjustice
contact info
Stephen Daniel Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Plaintiff
Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Represented By
Hannah Payne Foster
Earthjustice
contact info
Jaclyn H. Prange
Natural Resources Defense Council
contact info
Erik Clifford Grafe
Earthjustice
contact info
Irene Vibal Gutierrez
Natural Resources Defense Council
contact info
Plaintiff
Northern Alaska Environmental Center
Represented By
Brettny E. Hardy
Earthjustice (ca)
contact info
Hannah Payne Foster
Earthjustice
contact info
George Torgun
Earthjustice
contact info
Erik Clifford Grafe
Earthjustice
contact info
Stephen Daniel Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Plaintiff
Oceana, Inc.
Represented By
Brettny E. Hardy
Earthjustice (ca)
contact info
Hannah Payne Foster
Earthjustice
contact info
George Torgun
Earthjustice
contact info
Erik Clifford Grafe
Earthjustice
contact info
Stephen Daniel Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Plaintiff
Sierra Club
Represented By
Devorah Ancel
contact info
Hannah Payne Foster
Earthjustice
contact info
Erik Clifford Grafe
Earthjustice
contact info
Plaintiff
Surfrider Foundation
Represented By
Brettny E. Hardy
Earthjustice (ca)
contact info
Hannah Payne Foster
Earthjustice
contact info
George Torgun
Earthjustice
contact info
Erik Clifford Grafe
Earthjustice
contact info
Stephen Daniel Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info
Plaintiff
Turtle Island Restoration Network
Represented By
Brettny E. Hardy
Earthjustice (ca)
contact info
Hannah Payne Foster
Earthjustice
contact info
George Torgun
Earthjustice
contact info
Erik Clifford Grafe
Earthjustice
contact info
Stephen Daniel Mashuda
Earthjustice
contact info


Docket last updated: 32 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
31 31 20 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/07 3:09 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by American Petroleum Institute.(Morgan, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Intervene Mon 05/05 8:44 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion of the American Petroleum Institute for Leave to Intervene as a Defendant. A clean copy of its Answer shall be filed within 7 days of the date of this order . Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 5/5/2025. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
29 29 respm Response to Motion (Non-Opposition) Thu 05/01 8:14 AM
RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) re21 MOTION to Intervene filed by Doug Burgum, Howard W. Lutnick, Donald J. Trump. (Hajek, Luther)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
28 28 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 04/21 11:59 AM
SLG TEXT ORDER : Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint at Docket25 is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants' response to the Complaint is extended to May 26, 2025. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
27 27 notice Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application Fri 04/18 12:08 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re24 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel S. Volchok, at docket24 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (JDS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/18 11:30 AM
ORDER RE CHAMBERS COPIES: The parties shall provide a chambers copy of every filing that exceeds 50 pages, including attachments. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 4/18/2025. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/18 9:51 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, Unopposed by Doug Burgum, Howard W. Lutnick, Donald J. Trump.(Hajek, Luther)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 17, 2025
24 24 motion Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov Thu 04/17 1:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Daniel S. Volchok. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3766202.) by American Petroleum Institute.(Volchok, Daniel)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/17 12:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Petroleum Institute. (Morgan, Jason)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/17 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cody Doig on behalf of American Petroleum Institute (Doig, Cody)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Intervene Thu 04/17 9:42 AM
MOTION to Intervene by American Petroleum Institute.(Morgan, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Holly Hopkins,
Att: 2 Proposed Answer,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Wed 03/19 9:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greenpeace, Inc., Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Oceana, Inc., Turtle Island Restoration Network, Alaska Wilderness League, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Surfrider Foundation, Center for Biological Diversity, Healthy Gulf, Sierra Club. All Defendants. (Torgun, George)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
19 19 notice Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application Thu 03/13 10:34 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re17 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Irene V. Gutierrez, at docket17 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (SCD, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
18 18 misc Additional Related Document Tue 03/11 3:20 PM
**PLEASE DISREGARD-DUPLICATE FILING** ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT Application + Signature Page by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. re17 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Irene Vibal Gutierrez. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3743117.). (Gutierrez, Irene) Modified on 3/13/2025 dup doc of dkt 17. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
17 17 motion Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov Thu 02/27 2:44 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Irene Vibal Gutierrez. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3743117.) by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Gutierrez, Irene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
16 16 notice Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application Wed 02/26 10:32 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re14 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jaclyn H. Prange, at docket14 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (JDS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application Wed 02/26 10:30 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re13 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Devorah Ancel, at docket13 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (JDS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
14 14 motion Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov Tue 02/25 3:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Jaclyn H. Prange. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3741443.) by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Prange, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov Tue 02/25 8:22 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Devorah Ancel. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3740655.) by Sierra Club.(Ancel, Devorah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/20 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Related Case by Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, Greenpeace, Inc., Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Oceana, Inc., Sierra Club, Surfrider Foundation, Turtle Island Restoration Network (Mashuda, Stephen)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order Reassigning Case Thu 02/20 9:04 AM
HRH TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE : At the request of Judge Holland, this case has been reassigned to Chief Judge Sharon L. Gleason for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:25-cv-00038-SLG. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
10 10 notice Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application Wed 02/19 3:51 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brettny Hardy, at docket6 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application Wed 02/19 3:49 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by George Torgun, at docket5 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application Wed 02/19 3:47 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen D. Mashuda, at docket4 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Unissued Summons Wed 02/19 10:38 AM
Unissued summons re Defendant AG, US Dept. of Justice,(LMH, COURT STAFF, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Dept of Commerce,
Att: 2 2 pgs Unissued Summons re Defendant Dept of Interior,
Att: 3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Donald Trump,
Att: 4 Unissued Summons re Defendant US Attorney
6 6 motion Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov Wed 02/19 10:30 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Brettny Hardy. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3737370.) by Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, Greenpeace, Inc., Healthy Gulf, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Oceana, Inc., Surfrider Foundation, Turtle Island Restoration Network.(Hardy, Brettny)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
5 5 motion Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov Wed 02/19 10:26 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney George Torgun. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number BAKDC-3737363.) by Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, Greenpeace, Inc., Healthy Gulf, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Oceana, Inc., Surfrider Foundation, Turtle Island Restoration Network.(Torgun, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
4 4 motion Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov Wed 02/19 10:23 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Stephen D. Mashuda. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3737343.) by Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, Greenpeace, Inc., Healthy Gulf, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Oceana, Inc., Surfrider Foundation, Turtle Island Restoration Network.(Mashuda, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/19 10:16 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, Greenpeace, Inc., Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Oceana, Inc., Sierra Club, Surfrider Foundation, Turtle Island Restoration Network. (Grafe, Erik)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 02/19 10:10 AM
Civil Cover Sheet. (Grafe, Erik)
Related: [-]
1 1 46 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/19 10:09 AM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Doug Burgum, Howard W. Lutnick, Donald J. Trump ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AAKDC-3737311.), filed by Greenpeace, Inc., Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Oceana, Inc., Turtle Island Restoration Network, Alaska Wilderness League, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Surfrider Foundation, Center for Biological Diversity, Healthy Gulf, Sierra Club.(Grafe, Erik)
Related: [-]
notice Clerks Notice Wed 02/19 10:35 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to the system of random case assignment, this case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge H. Russel Holland. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:25-cv-00038-HRH. (LMH, COURT STAFF, )
Related: [-]
service 1 - Summons Issued as to USA Wed 02/19 10:39 AM
Summons Issued as to Doug Burgum, Howard W. Lutnick, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (LMH, COURT STAFF, )
Related: [-]