California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:25-cv-01402
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 3:37 AM PDT
Defendant
Elizabeth Esquer
Represented By
Cris A Klingerman
Robert E Weiss Incorporated
contact info
Defendant
Rodeen Investment Group LLC
Represented By
Cris A Klingerman
Robert E Weiss Incorporated
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
Ana Ventura
Represented By
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
22 22 misc Statement Fri 04/18 4:54 PM
STATEMENT re: Order Granting Application for Stay and Early Mediation filed by Plaintiff Ana Ventura re: Order on Application to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22),21 . (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
21 21 order Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22) Tue 04/08 1:44 PM
ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: GRANTING18 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to Defendants Elizabeth Esquer and Rodeen Investment Group LLC. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 6/17/2025. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
20 20 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 04/01 2:19 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation,18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. 2 SEPARATE Applications as to 2 defendants e-filed under one event. Missing corresponding order form as to each of 2 defendants. Default by Clerk entered against defendant ELIZABETH ESQUER D/B/A LOVELY BEAUTY SALON docket no. 19. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Tue 04/01 8:39 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to ELIZABETH ESQUER D/B/A LOVELY BEAUTY SALON (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
18 18 motion Stay Case and Early Mediation (ADR-21) Mon 03/31 1:42 PM
APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendants Elizabeth Esquer, Rodeen Investment Group LLC. (Attorney Cris A Klingerman added to party Elizabeth Esquer(pty:dft), Attorney Cris A Klingerman added to party Rodeen Investment Group LLC(pty:dft)) (Klingerman, Cris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application for Stay and Early Mediation
17 17 motion Clerk to Enter Default Mon 03/31 11:41 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Elizabeth Esquer filed by plaintiff Ana Ventura. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
16 16 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 03/25 3:40 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ana Ventura, upon Defendant Rodeen Investment Group LLC served on 3/24/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon LORI FOLEY, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
15 15 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 03/10 10:31 AM
MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim and any other construction-related accessibility claim. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. See28 U.S.C. Sec. 1367(c)(4). (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 03/07 4:41 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ana Ventura, upon Defendant Elizabeth Esquer served on 3/7/2025, answer due 3/28/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ELIZABETH ESQUER, DEFENDANT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Response Fri 03/07 3:23 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Ana Venturato Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,12 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Friday, February 21, 2025
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 02/21 3:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and any other state law claim asserted in the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than two weeks from the date of this Order. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act and other state law claims, if any, and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to28 U.S.C. § 1367(c). (lc)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 02/21 2:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: ORDER REGARDING PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT. The Court finds that there is good cause to institute a limited scheduling order concerning basic case prosecution for cases under the Americans With Disabilities Act involving physical barriers in places of public accommodation. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC ENUMERATED REQUIREMENTS AND DEADLINES THEREIN). The failure to comply with this Order in a particular case will result in a sanction of $300.00 payable to the clerk of the court within two weeks of Plaintiff being given notice of noncompliance and dismissal for lack of prosecution. The Court finds these sanctions sufficient and necessary to deter violations of the Order and to achieve timely prosecution of these cases without unnecessary intervention by the Court. (lc)
Related: [-]
10 10 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Fri 02/21 2:56 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lc)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 02/21 2:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR EXCEPT FOR motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the US District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 02/21 11:58 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Elizabeth Esquer, Rodeen Investment Group LLC. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 02/21 11:52 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 02/21 11:51 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 02/21 11:51 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 02/19 3:07 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Ana Ventura. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 02/19 3:05 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 02/19 3:04 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ana Ventura. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/19 3:04 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39134825 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Ana Ventura(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]