Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 1:25-cv-00246
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 6:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Oracle America, Inc.
Defendant
Oracle Corporation
Plaintiff
MOV-ology LLC
Represented By
Patrick A. Fitch
Prince Lobel Tye LLP
contact info
Jonathan DeBlois
Prince Lobel Tye LLP
contact info
Karl Anthony Rupp
Sorey & Hoover LLP
contact info
Robert R. Gilman
Prince Lobel Tye LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Fri 05/16 3:59 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Oracle Corporation for Oracle America, Inc.. (Amstutz, Paige)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 05/16 3:56 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Oracle Corporation and Oracle America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation.(Amstutz, Paige)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of P. Amstutz,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Thursday, May 15, 2025
12 12 notice Notice Thu 05/15 8:32 PM
NOTICE Joint Notice Under OGP Section VII by MOV-ology LLC (Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 05/15 8:08 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paige Arnette Amstutz on behalf of Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation. Attorney Paige Arnette Amstutz added to party Oracle America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paige Arnette Amstutz added to party Oracle Corporation(pty:dft) (Amstutz, Paige)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
misc Remark (No Doc#) Thu 04/03 4:59 PM
Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's[LINK:Standing Order Governing Proceedings (OGP) - Patent Cases] . (bot4)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/17 12:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MOV-ology LLC. Oracle America, Inc. served on 3/12/2025, answer due 5/16/2025. (Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/17 12:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MOV-ology LLC. Oracle Corporation served on 3/12/2025, answer due 5/16/2025. (Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
8 8 notice Notice Thu 03/13 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Unopposed Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint by MOV-ology LLC (Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 03/14 3:31 PM
Reset Deadlines: Oracle America, Inc. answer due 5/16/2025; Oracle Corporation answer due 5/16/2025. (dm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
misc Remark (No Doc#) Tue 03/11 1:34 PM
Parties shall comply with Judge Albrights[LINK:Standing Order Governing Proceedings - Patent Cases] . (bot4)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/03 11:17 AM
ORDER GRANTING4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Patrick A. Fitch. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (dm)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 02/28 11:12 AM
Summons Issued as to Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (dm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/27 8:45 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by MOV-ology LLC. to Oracle Corporation and Oracle America, Inc. (Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/27 8:06 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karl Anthony Rupp on behalf of Patrick A. Fitch ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19843299) by on behalf of MOV-ology LLC.(Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 21, 2025
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Fri 02/21 10:13 AM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MOV-ology LLC. (Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Wed 02/19 4:22 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/19 4:19 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19811527). No Summons requested at this time, filed by MOV-ology LLC.(Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - 531 Patent,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - 282 Patent,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - 281 Patent,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - 358 Patent,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - 531 Claim Chart,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - 282 Claim Chart,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - 281 Claim Chart,
Att: 9 Exhibit H - 358 Claim Chart
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/24 8:51 AM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Mon 02/24 8:52 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 02/24 8:52 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MOV-ology LLC. (kp)
Related: [-]