California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Case #: 2:25-cv-01410
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 3:40 AM PDT
Defendant
Lior Alkoby
Defendant
MTD Kitchen, Inc.
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Cesar Acevedo
Represented By
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
16 16 motion Clerk to Enter Default Fri 05/16 11:22 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Lior Alkoby filed by plaintiff Cesar Acevedo. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
15 15 notice Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form Wed 05/07 8:29 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Lior Alkoby14 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Due to substituted service, time to respond has not expired. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
14 14 motion Clerk to Enter Default Tue 05/06 9:52 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Lior Alkoby filed by plaintiff Cesar Acevedo. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 04/29 11:09 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cesar Acevedo, upon Defendant Lior Alkoby served on 4/14/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
12 12 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Tue 04/15 8:22 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to MTD KITCHEN, INC. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
11 11 motion Clerk to Enter Default Mon 04/14 12:46 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant MTD Kitchen, Inc. filed by plaintiff Cesar Acevedo. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 04/10 10:04 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cesar Acevedo, upon Defendant MTD Kitchen, Inc. served on 3/13/2025, answer due 4/3/2025. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
9 9 10 pgs order Order Mon 02/24 3:26 PM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/19 4:41 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Lior Alkoby, MTD Kitchen, Inc. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 02/19 4:40 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 02/19 4:40 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 02/19 4:39 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (lh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 02/19 3:45 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Cesar Acevedo. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 02/19 3:45 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 02/19 3:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Cesar Acevedo. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/19 3:42 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39135663 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Cesar Acevedo(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]