Shelly Lynn Medlar v. Leland Dudek
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sheri Pym |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:25-cv-00458 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Feb 19, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 AS LIMITED TO THE ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE OF THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL FEDERAL RULES FOR SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTIONS UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), RULE 4(b) (cu) filed by Defendant Leland Dudek.(Marriott, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Wednesday, March 05, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/05 12:59 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. Please use the case number 5:25-cv-00458 SP on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (rn) |
|
Tuesday, March 04, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Leland Dudek. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Leland Dudek(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: GRANTING2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (yl) |
|
6 | 6
![]() CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Shelly Lynn Medlar. (Holmberg, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, February 20, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (sh) |
|
Wednesday, February 19, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shelly Lynn Medlar, (Holmberg, Matthew) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shelly Lynn Medlar. (Holmberg, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
![]() REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Shelly Lynn Medlar. (Holmberg, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Shelly Lynn Medlar. (Attorney Matthew Franklin Holmberg added to party Shelly Lynn Medlar(pty:pla))(Holmberg, Matthew) |