California Central District Court
Judge:Sheri Pym
Referred: Sheri Pym
Case #: 5:25-cv-00458
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 04/21 9:27 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 AS LIMITED TO THE ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE OF THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL FEDERAL RULES FOR SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTIONS UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), RULE 4(b) (cu) filed by Defendant Leland Dudek.(Marriott, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Page 04 11-2025
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index 04 11-2025
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable 06 26-2023
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions 06 26-2023
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 06 26-2023
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development 06 26-2023
Att: 7 Disability Related Development 06 26-2023
Att: 8 Medical Records 06 26-2023
Att: 9 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable 04 11-2025
Att: 10 Payment Documents and Decisions 04 11-2025
Att: 11 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 04 11-2025
Att: 12 Non Disability Related Development 04 11-2025
Att: 13 Disability Related Development 04 11-2025
Att: 14 Medical Records 04 11-2025 Part 1,
Att: 15 Medical Records 04 11-2025 Part 2,
Att: 16 Medical Records 04 11-2025 Part 3,
Att: 17 Medical Records 04 11-2025 Part 4
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
9 9 notice Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge Wed 03/05 12:59 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. Please use the case number 5:25-cv-00458 SP on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
8 8 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) Tue 03/04 10:18 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Leland Dudek. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Leland Dudek(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
7 7 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Sun 02/23 4:24 PM
ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: GRANTING2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (yl)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA) Fri 02/21 8:34 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Shelly Lynn Medlar. (Holmberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Thu 02/20 9:34 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 02/19 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shelly Lynn Medlar, (Holmberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 02/19 3:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shelly Lynn Medlar. (Holmberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Wed 02/19 3:08 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Shelly Lynn Medlar. (Holmberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/19 3:04 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Shelly Lynn Medlar. (Attorney Matthew Franklin Holmberg added to party Shelly Lynn Medlar(pty:pla))(Holmberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]