California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: David T Bristow
Case #: 5:25-cv-00459
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 3:40 AM PDT
Defendant
Equity Wave Lending, Inc.
Defendant
Paula Annette Johnson
Defendant
Stephen Henry Johnson
Defendant
Friend Industries, LLC
Plaintiff
U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By
Regina J McClendon
Troutman Pepper Locke LLP
contact info
Heather C Smith
Troutman Pepper Locke LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
41 41 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 05/14 1:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., re REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Friend Industries, LLC40 served on May 14, 2025. (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
40 40 motion Clerk to Enter Default Wed 05/14 1:40 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Friend Industries, LLC filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Regina J. McClendon in Support of Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Friend Industries, LLC, a Purported California Limited Liability Company
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
39 39 order Dismiss Case Tue 05/13 11:01 AM
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS [DKT. NO.29 ] by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr: The motion is meritless. For the reasons stated in the opposition, the Johnsons have not shown that any of the causes of action in the FAC fails to state a plausible claim for relief. The motion to dismiss is denied, and the Johnsons shall answer the FAC no later than May 23, 2025. Failure to timely answer the FAC will subject the Johnsons to entry of default. See document for further information. (es)
Related: [-]
38 38 notice Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form Tue 05/13 8:12 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Friend Industries, LLC26 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: The name of the person served does not exactly match the person named in complaint. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
37 37 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 05/09 10:13 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., re Request for Judicial Notice,36 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related)35 served on May 9, 2025. (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc For Judicial Notice Fri 05/09 10:11 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case29 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A..(McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-6
35 35 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Fri 05/09 10:06 AM
Opposition in Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case29 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
34 34 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 05/07 4:24 PM
AMENDED ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference hearing on May 30, 2025, at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND DEADLINE TO FILE A JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT. (lfa)
Related: [-]
33 33 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 05/07 4:12 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference hearing on May 30, 2025, at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND DEADLINE TO FILE A JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT. (lfa)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Transfer DECLINED-(related case)(CV-34) Wed 05/07 4:00 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related [+] filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Percy Anderson, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 5:16-cv-02136 PA (GJSx) (lh)
Related: [-] lated Case
Monday, May 05, 2025
31 31 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Crossclaim Mon 05/05 5:02 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,15 , CROSSCLAIM against Paula Annette Johnson, Stephen Henry Johnson filed by Defendant/Cross Claimant Equity Wave Lending, Inc..(Catalanotti, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
30 30 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 04/29 11:04 AM
(In Chambers) Order by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court's order for Plaintiff to show cause (OSC) why its claims should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution in light of Defendants' failure to appear has become largely moot: (1) Defendants Stephen and Paula Johnson timely filed a motion to dismiss, which was not entered on the docket until today due to a delay in the clerk's office; (2) Plaintiff filed a stipulation to extend the time for Defendant Equity Wave Lending, Inc. to answer the First Amended Complaint (FAC) until May 5; and (3) Plaintiff has sought entry of default against the Johnsons and Friend Industries, LLC. Although it should have been filed before the answer deadline passed, the stipulation is granted, and Equity Wave Lending, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the FAC by May 5, 2025. Plaintiff's requests for entry of default as to Stephen and Paula Johnson (but not as to Friend Industries, LLC, which has not appeared) are denied as moot, and the OSC is discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lfa)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Tue 04/29 9:36 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., re REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Friend Industries, LLC26 , Notice of Related Case(s)27 , REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Paula Annette Johnson25 , REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Stephen Henry Johnson24 served on April 29, 2025. (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Related Case(s) Tue 04/29 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. Related Case(s): 5:16-cv-02136-PA-GJS, 5:19-cv-01387-PA-GJS, 5:25-cv-00506-MWC-SP (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Clerk to Enter Default Tue 04/29 9:31 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Friend Industries, LLC filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Regina J. McClendon in Support of Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Friend Industries, LLC
25 25 motion Clerk to Enter Default Tue 04/29 9:29 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Paula Annette Johnson filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Regina J. McClendon in Support of Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Paula Annette Johnson aka Paula A. Johnson, in her individual capacity and as co-trustee of the Johnson Family Trust, U/A dated January 6, 2023
24 24 motion Clerk to Enter Default Tue 04/29 9:27 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Stephen Henry Johnson filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Regina J. McClendon in Support of Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Stephen Henry Johnson aka Stephen H. Johnson, in his individual capacity and as co-trustee of the Johnson Family Trust, U/A dated January 6, 2023
Monday, April 28, 2025
23 23 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 04/28 3:35 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Equity Wave Lending, Inc. answer now due 5/5/2025, Equity Wave Lending, Inc..(Attorney Peter C Catalanotti added to party Equity Wave Lending, Inc.(pty:dft))(Catalanotti, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order re Stip to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint
Friday, April 25, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 04/28 12:59 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing, no later than May 5, 2025, why its claims should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. No oral argument on this matter will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. [See document for further details.] (san)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
29 29 motion Dismiss Case Tue 04/29 10:21 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Stephen H. Johnson and Paula A. Johnson. Motion set for hearing on 5/30/2025 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. (gk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Lodged Proposed Order
Monday, April 07, 2025
21 21 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 04/07 9:30 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., upon Defendant Friend Industries, LLC served on 4/3/2025, answer due 4/24/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Stephen Henry Johnson, Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 04/07 9:25 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., upon Defendant Paula Annette Johnson served on 4/3/2025, answer due 4/24/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paula Annette Johnson aka Paula A. Johnson, in her individual capacity and as co-trustee of the Johnson Family Trust, U/A dated January 6, 2023 in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 04/07 9:21 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., upon Defendant Stephen Henry Johnson served on 4/3/2025, answer due 4/24/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Stephen Henry Johnson aka Stephen H. Johnson, in his individual capacity and as co-trustee of the Johnson Family Trust, U/A dated January 6, 2023 in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
18 18 service Summons Issued Mon 03/24 10:58 AM
21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint15 as to Defendant Friend Industries, LLC. (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
17 17 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 03/17 4:30 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., upon Defendant Equity Wave Lending, Inc. served on 3/17/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jack Suddarth, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Summons Request Mon 03/17 9:30 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,15 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
15 15 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Mon 03/17 9:28 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Equity Wave Lending, Inc., Paula Annette Johnson, Stephen Henry Johnson, Friend Industries, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.(McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-12
Thursday, March 13, 2025
14 14 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 03/13 11:49 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., re Lis Pendens Notice13 served on March 12, 2025. (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Lis Pendens Notice Thu 03/13 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 02/24 10:27 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., upon Defendant Equity Wave Lending, Inc. served on 2/21/2025, answer due 3/14/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jack Suddarth, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 02/21 9:36 AM
Standing Order upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (lfa)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 02/21 9:35 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Equity Wave Lending, Inc., Paula Annette Johnson, Stephen Henry Johnson. (lh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons as to Defendant Paula Annette Johnson,
Att: 2 Summons as to Defendant Equity Wave Lending, Inc.
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 02/21 9:30 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 02/21 9:29 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 02/21 9:29 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
6 6 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 02/19 3:38 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., identifying U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.; U.S. Bancorp. (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Wed 02/19 3:34 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 02/19 3:33 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Wed 02/19 3:32 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 02/19 3:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/19 3:22 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39135049 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Attorney Regina J McClendon added to party U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (pty:pla))(McClendon, Regina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-11