Nevada District Court
Case #: 2:25-cv-00328
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2025
Terminated:Feb 20, 2025
Case in other court:Second Judicial District Court, CV24-02325
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 4:24 AM PDT
Defendant
Copart of Arizona, Inc. dba Copart
Represented By
Philip A. John
Wood Smith Henning Berman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Copart of Arizona, Inc. dba Copart Dealer Services
Represented By
Philip A. John
Wood Smith Henning Berman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Copart of Arizona, Inc. dba Copart Direct
Represented By
Philip A. John
Wood Smith Henning Berman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Millis
Represented By
Philip A. John
Wood Smith Henning Berman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Anastasia Montanez
Represented By
Philip A. John
Wood Smith Henning Berman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sarah Ricketts
Represented By
Philip A. John
Wood Smith Henning Berman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jason Stroberg
Represented By
Philip A. John
Wood Smith Henning Berman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Huong Bui
Represented By
Regina M. Bradley
Bradley, Drendel & Jeanney
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 20, 2025
2 2 misc Docket Entry - Generic Thu 02/20 10:37 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to LR IA 1-6 and LR IA 1-8 this case was improperly opened in the unofficial southern division of the District of Nevada. This case is being transferred to the unofficial northern division of the District of Nevada and assign case number 3:25-cv-000102. All future filings are to be made in the Northern Division. This case is closed. (WJ)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Thu 02/20 9:45 AM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Case Number CV24-02325, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7962099) by Jason Stroberg, Copart of Arizona, Inc. dba Copart, Copart of Arizona, Inc. dba Copart Direct, Matthew Millis, Anastasia Montanez, Sarah Ricketts, Copart of Arizona, Inc. dba Copart Dealer Services. Proof of service due by 1/8/2025. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/2/2025. (John, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I