Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Referred: Russell G Vineyard
Case #: 1:25-cv-00860
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 6:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Kingston Point Manor Homeowners Association, Inc.
Defendant
Razsha Preston
Defendant
The United States of America
Plaintiff
PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By
Thomas Sears
Padgett Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 32 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
10 10 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 03/12 2:12 PM
Summons Issued as to The United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(tas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 03/12 2:11 PM
Summons Issued as to Razsha Preston. (tas)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 03/12 2:11 PM
Summons Issued as to Kingston Point Manor Homeowners Association, Inc. (tas)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order on Motion to Strike Wed 03/12 2:02 PM
Order (by docket entry only): Plaintiff's motion to strike4 is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to strike the proposed summons2 and summons3 from the docket. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to separately file on the docket the corrected proposed summonses [4-1] and to issue corrected summonses. SO ORDERED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 3/12/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
6 6 30+ pgs order Order Tue 03/11 3:59 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 3/11/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/11 2:42 PM
ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to change the Nature of Suit code to 190 and to terminate the referral of this action and assign a replacement foreclosure action to the undersigned consistent with Standing Order No. 18-01. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 3/11/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred Tue 03/11 2:44 PM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
4 4 motion Strike Wed 03/05 5:17 PM
First MOTION to Strike3 Summons Issued as to USA,2 Proposed Summons by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC.(Sears, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 for Motion to Strike,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Strike
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 03/04 9:15 AM
Summons Issued as to The United States of America, U.S. Attorney.(tas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Monday, March 03, 2025
2 2 service Proposed Summons Mon 03/03 1:18 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC(Sears, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/19 11:34 PM
COMPLAINT filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14073910)(tcc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet