Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Eldon E Fallon
Referred: Eva J Dossier
Case #: 2:25-mc-00309
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Cause00:0000 Cause Code Unknown
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
5 5 2 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 04/04 11:35 AM
Summons Issued as to AFP Exploration Inc, ENR Gibson LLC, Evangeline Natural Resources, LLC, Ironstone Energy LLC, K Exploration Co.(amj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Summons,
Att: 2 2 pgs Summons,
Att: 3 2 pgs Summons,
Att: 4 2 pgs Summons
Thursday, April 03, 2025
4 4 1 pgs misc Request Thu 04/03 9:52 AM
Request by Heirs of the Estate of George Matthews for Summons(Roy, Leon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Summons,
Att: 2 1 pgs Summons,
Att: 3 1 pgs Summons,
Att: 4 1 pgs Summons
Thursday, February 20, 2025
3 3 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Thu 02/20 11:50 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Petition to Perpetuate Testimony. 1) Documents submitted as legal sized documents. Local Rule 10.1E: All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11. Clerk has reduced images. 2) Proposed Order should be added as a separate attachment to the motion and not as part of the motion. Clerk took corrective action. No further action needed. (amj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Wed 02/19 3:42 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier. (cc)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs misccs Petition to Perpetuate Testimony Wed 02/19 3:18 PM
PETITION to Perpetuate Testimony (Filing fee $ 52 receipt number ALAEDC-10891792) filed by The Heirs of the Estate of George Matthews.Attorney Leon E Roy, IV added to party The Heirs of the Estate of George Matthews(pty:pla).(Roy, Leon)
Related: [-]