Delaware District Court
Judge:Maryellen Noreika
Case #: 1:25-cv-00204
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 6:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Dijura Pty Ltd.
Defendant
Ashirvad Tomar
Plaintiff
Global Brother SRL
Represented By
Neal C. Belgam
Smith, Katzenstein, & Jenkins LLP
contact info
Daniel Taylor
Smith, Katzenstein & Jenkins LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 day ddl Fri 05/09 2:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Global Brother SRL: For Dijura Pty Ltd. waiver sent on 5/8/2025, answer due 8/6/2025; Ashirvad Tomar waiver sent on 5/8/2025, answer due 8/6/2025. (Taylor, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/26 1:07 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:25-cv-00203-MN, 1:25-cv-00204-MN (rjb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 02/20 9:19 AM
Summons Issued as to Dijura Pty Ltd. (cdd)
Related: [-]
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Thu 02/20 11:08 AM
CORRECTING ENTRY: Summonses Issued as to Ashivad Tomar and Dijura Pty Ltd. (D.I.5 and6 ) have been replaced to reflect that the court seal has been added. (slk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 02/20 8:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Ashirvad Tomar. (slk)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Thu 02/20 8:43 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Global Brother SRL. (slk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Copyright Report to Register of Copyrights Thu 02/20 8:41 AM
Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s)TXu002445l63,TXu002446715, VAu001533601, VAu001538856, TX0009246277, VA0002425155, TX0009021932, VA0002369247.(slk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copyright Report
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Thu 02/20 8:35 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (slk)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/20 8:34 AM
COMPLAINT against Dijura Pty Ltd., Ashirvad Tomar (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4618522) - filed by Global Brother SRL.(slk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet