Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ada Brown
Case #: 3:25-cv-00421
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 5:36 AM CDT
Defendant
Home Depot USA Inc
Represented By
Shaina Elise Hicks
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC
contact info
Kristin Snyder Higgins
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Hollis
Represented By
Karen K Fitzgerald
Fitzgerald Law PLLC
contact info
Corinna Pia Chandler
Chandler & Shavin, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
14 14 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/22 3:12 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 9/1/2026 before Judge Ada Brown. Joinder of Parties due by 8/29/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 8/29/2025. Motions due by 4/17/2026. Discovery due by 3/17/2026. Pretrial Order due by 8/4/2026. Pretrial Materials due by 8/4/2026. Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2026 10:00 AM before Judge Ada Brown. Deadline for mediation is on or before 9/12/2025. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 4/22/2025) (agc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 04/21 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shaina Elise Hicks on behalf of Home Depot USA Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hicks, Shaina)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Status Report Mon 04/21 4:20 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Home Depot USA Inc. (Higgins, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
11 11 misc Remark Wed 04/02 10:32 AM
Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge Horan recused. Pursuant to instructions in Special Order 3-249, Magistrate Judge McKay has been chosen by random selection to handle matters that may be referred in this case. (twd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
10 10 order Status Report Order Mon 03/31 1:59 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report Due 3 Weeks from the Date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/31/2025) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
9 9 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 03/28 4:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot USA Inc. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Higgins, Kristin)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/28 4:07 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Home Depot USA Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Higgins, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 03/17 9:57 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting6 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's response due on or before March 28, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/17/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
6 6 motion Extension of Time Fri 03/14 11:19 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Home Depot USA IncAttorney Kristin Snyder Higgins added to party Home Depot USA Inc(pty:dft) (Higgins, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Wed 02/26 4:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Home Depot USA Inc; served on 2/21/2025. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 02/20 12:08 PM
Summons Issued as to Home Depot USA Inc. (knb)
Related: [-]
3 3 qcref Brown Thu 02/20 12:07 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (knb)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 02/20 10:31 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kenneth Hollis. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Fitzgerald, Karen)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/20 10:30 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Home Depot USA, Inc. filed by Kenneth Hollis. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15279692) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Fitzgerald, Karen) (Attachment 1 replaced to flatten on 2/20/2025) (knb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet