California Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew G Schopler
Referred: Michael S Berg
Case #: 3:25-cv-00372
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 3:09 AM PDT
Defendant
Does 1 through 10
Defendant
GEO Secure Services, LLC
Represented By
Alexandra R. Volpicelli
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Michael Lee Kibbe
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Defendant
The Geo Group, Inc.
Represented By
Alexandra R. Volpicelli
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Michael Lee Kibbe
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Perla Cham
Represented By
Ryan Kuhn
Sullivan & Yaeckel Law Group, Apc
contact info
Eric K. Yaeckel
Sullivan Law Group LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
14 14 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings Mon 04/07 4:45 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 4/7/2025. Settlement discussions are ongoing. Further Settlement Conference is SET for 5/19/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg via videoconference. Parties shall send their participants' names and email addresses to efile_berg@casd.uscourts.gov by 5/14/2025. Case Management Conference is RESET for 5/19/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg.(Plaintiff Attorney Eric K. Yaeckel). (Defendant Attorney Alexandra R. Volpicelli; Arien Koorn). (no document attached) (cxy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
13 13 minutes Status Conference Thu 04/03 5:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Pre-Early Neutral Evaluation Status Conference held on 4/3/2025. Judge Berg spoke with each parties' counsel individually to prepare for mediation.(Plaintiff Attorney Eric K. Yaeckel). (Defendant Attorney Alexandra R. Volpicelli). (no document attached) (cxy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) Wed 04/02 2:04 PM
ORDER Denying Defendants' Request to Continue the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Pending Ruling on Motion to Compel Arbitration re (ECF NO.11 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 04/02/2025. (mef)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/31 5:58 PM
NOTICE REQUEST TO CONTINUE THE EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION CONFERENCE PENDING RULING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by GEO Secure Services, LLC, The Geo Group, Inc.(Volpicelli, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Alexandra Volpicelli
10 10 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 03/31 4:38 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Volpicelli, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
9 9 service Certificate of Service Tue 03/25 3:26 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GEO Secure Services, LLC, The Geo Group, Inc. re8 Notice of Lodgment,7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings (Volpicelli, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Lodgment Tue 03/25 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Lodgment by GEO Secure Services, LLC, The Geo Group, Inc. re7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings (Volpicelli, Alexandra) (mef)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Compel Tue 03/25 2:17 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings by GEO Secure Services, LLC, The Geo Group, Inc..(Volpicelli, Alexandra)***QC MAILER sent re attached proposed order***(mef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of Alexandra Volpicelli,
Att: 3 Declaration of Brenda Kelly,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 20, 2025
6 6 6 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/20 11:25 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER for: (1) Early Neutral Evaluation, (2) Case Management Conference, and (3) Pre-ENE Status Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 4/7/2025 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2025 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Status Conference set for 4/3/2025 at 10:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Joint Discovery Plan due 3/31/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 02/20/2025.(mef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/20 9:22 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEO Secure Services, LLC, The Geo Group, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock Fund Advisors, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for GEO Secure Services, LLC, The Geo Group, Inc.(axc1). (anh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Thu 02/20 9:19 AM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by GEO Secure Services, LLC, The Geo Group, Inc.. Identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock Fund Advisors, Other Affiliate GEO Corrections Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate GEO Operations, Inc, for GEO Secure Services, LLC, The Geo Group, Inc. (axc1). (anh)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Related Case Thu 02/20 9:14 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by GEO Secure Services, LLC, The Geo Group, Inc.(axc1). (anh)
Related: [-]
2 2 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 02/20 9:11 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by GEO Secure Services, LLC, The Geo Group, Inc.(axc1). (anh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 02/20 9:09 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19619518.), filed by GEO Secure Services, LLC, The Geo Group, Inc.. The new case number is 3:25-cv-372-AGS-MSB. Judge Andrew G. Schopler and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (axc1). (anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Declaration of Alexandra Volpicelli,
Att: 5 Declaration of Spencer Winepol,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service