Consolidated
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:25-cv-00149
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Case in other court:California Central, 5:25-cv-00167
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 5:27 AM EDT
Defendant
GREENSTONE LLC
Defendant
PFIZER INC
Defendant
PHARMACIA AND UPJOHN COMPANY LLC
Defendant
PHARMACIA LLC
Defendant
PRASCO LLC
Defendant
VIATRIS INC
Interested Party
JACOB WOODY
Plaintiff
MARGAUX TOGSTAD
Represented By
TRACY ANN FINKEN
Anapol Weiss - Philadelphia PA
contact info
Paige N. Boldt
Anapol Weiss
contact info
AVA MARIE M CAVACO
Nigh Goldenberg Et Al - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
ASHLEIGH RASO
Nigh Goldenberg Raso & Vaughn - Washington Dc
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
28 28 service Affidavit of Service Mon 03/31 10:08 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Viatris, Inc. on 3/26/25, filed by MARGAUX TOGSTAD. (RASO, ASHLEIGH)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Affidavit of Service Mon 03/31 10:07 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Prasco, LLC on 3/25/25, filed by MARGAUX TOGSTAD. (RASO, ASHLEIGH)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
26 26 service Affidavit of Service Fri 03/28 9:22 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Greenstone LLC on 3/27/25, filed by MARGAUX TOGSTAD. (RASO, ASHLEIGH)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Affidavit of Service Fri 03/28 9:17 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Pharmacia LLC on 3/26/25, filed by MARGAUX TOGSTAD. (RASO, ASHLEIGH)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Affidavit of Service Fri 03/28 9:16 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Pharmacia & Upjohn on 3/26/25, filed by MARGAUX TOGSTAD. (RASO, ASHLEIGH)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Affidavit of Service Fri 03/28 9:15 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Pfizer Inc. on 3/26/2025, filed by MARGAUX TOGSTAD. (RASO, ASHLEIGH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
19 19 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:25-cv-00167. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
18 18 Conditional Transfer Order - (CTO-1) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3140, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
17 17 ORDER by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: granting15 Non-Resident Attorney Ashleigh E. Raso APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Margaux Togstad, designating Margaux Togstad as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: granting14 Non-Resident Attorney Tracy A. Finken APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Margaux Togstad, designating Margaux Togstad as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
15 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ashleigh E. Raso to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Margaux Togstad (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39012217) filed by PLAINTIFF Margaux Togstad. (Boldt, Paige) [Transferred from California Central on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
14 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tracy A. Finken to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Margaux Togstad (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39002950) filed by PLAINTIFF Margaux Togstad. (Boldt, Paige) [Transferred from California Central on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
13 13 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CIVIL CASES by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (hc) [Transferred from California Central on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
12 12 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges.by Judge Percy Anderson. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 5:25-cv-00167 WLH(DTBx). (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
11 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ava Cavaco. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ashleigh Raso. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Tracy A. Finken. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
8 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Greenstone LLC, Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Pharmacia and Upjohn Co. LLC, Prasco, LLC, Viatris Inc.. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
4 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Margaux Togstad, (Boldt, Paige) [Transferred from California Central on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by PLAINTIFF Margaux Togstad. (Boldt, Paige) [Transferred from California Central on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Margaux Togstad. (Boldt, Paige) [Transferred from California Central on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($405.00 paid on 01/22/2025, receipt number Tracking Id: ACACDC-38949643), filed by PLAINTIFF Margaux Togstad. (Attorney Paige N. Boldt added to party Margaux Togstad(pty:pla))(Boldt, Paige) [Transferred from California Central on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]