Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Martin C Carlson
Case #: 4:25-cv-00304
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Case in other court:Commonwealth Court of Pennsylvania, 611-MD-2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 5:56 AM EDT
Defendant
Cracker Barrel Country Store, Inc.
Represented By
Brian H. Leinhauser
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Matthew R Estberg
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelly Conard
338 Duke Street
Williamsport, PA 17701


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
order Verbal Order Reassigning Case to MJ Carlson (Prior MJ Arbuckle Case) Thu 04/24 5:56 PM
VERBAL ORDER by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann - Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Martin C Carlson. (jw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
10 10 respm Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Fri 03/28 12:32 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION filed by Kelly Conard re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.(nr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
Thursday, March 20, 2025
9 9 misc Consent Form Sent (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) Thu 03/20 4:01 PM
CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to All Parties YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Scranton Operations Supervisor, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 4/21/2025. (caw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order Fri 03/14 2:43 PM
BRIEFING ORDER re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cracker Barrel Country Store, Inc. - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: (1) Plaintiff shall file a brief in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before 3/28/2025. See Local Rule 7.6. Plaintiff is also advised that failure to file a brief in opposition may result in Defendant's motion being deemed unopposed, or the dismissal of this case. See Local Rule 7.6; Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. (2) All briefs will conform to the requirements of Local Rule 7.8. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 3/14/2025. (caw)
Related: [-]
7 7 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Fri 03/14 1:08 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cracker Barrel Country Store, Inc..(Leinhauser, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 03/14 12:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Cracker Barrel Country Store, Inc..(Leinhauser, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, March 07, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 03/07 2:04 PM
ORDER re4 Reply filed by Cracker Barrel Country Store, Inc. - pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(2)(C) Defendant's responsive pleading is now due on or before 3/14/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 3/7/2025. (caw)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Reply (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief) Fri 03/07 9:57 AM
REPLY by Cracker Barrel Country Store, Inc.. to3 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, .(Leinhauser, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C
Monday, March 03, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 03/03 3:54 PM
ORDER re1 Notice of Removal and2 Waiver of Service filed by Cracker Barrel Country Store, Inc. - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Defendant is instructed to file proof of service that Plaintiff has been given the proper notice and confirm the appropriate Court case for this notice of removal action on or before 3/10/2025. (2) The Clerk of Court is instructed to mark the Waiver of Service (Doc. 2) STRICKEN from the record. If Defendant is seeking an extension of time to answer, counsel is instructed to file an appropriate Motion for Extension of Time. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 3/3/2025. (caw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 02/26 10:59 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Cracker Barrel Country Store, Inc.. Cracker Barrel Country Store, Inc. waiver sent on 2/20/2025, answer due 4/21/2025. (Leinhauser, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice for Removal Thu 02/20 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cracker Barrel Country Store, Inc. from Commonwealth Court of Pennsylvania, case number 611-MD-2024. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 6905751), filed by Cracker Barrel Country Store, Inc..(nr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Commonwealth Documents,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Commonwealth Docket,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Commonwealth Notice of Filing,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet