Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Case #: 1:25-cv-00249
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 4:59 AM CDT
Defendant
MW Domino Management LLC
Represented By
Peter D. Kennedy
Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody, PC
contact info
James A. Hemphill
Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody, PC
contact info
Defendant
Muddy Waters Capital LLC
Represented By
Peter D. Kennedy
Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody, PC
contact info
James A. Hemphill
Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Techtronic Industries Company Limited
Represented By
Nicholas Inns
Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Laura N. Ferguson
Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Jason D. Sternberg
Quinn Emanuel
contact info
Kristin Tahler
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan
contact info
Asher B. Griffin
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
27 27 7 pgs order Order Wed 05/14 2:44 PM
ORDER FOR SCHEDULING RECOMMENDATIONS AND ADVISORY CONCERNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/05 11:51 AM
Text Order GRANTING the Unopposed26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is extended to May 27, 2025. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mmlc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 05/02 9:16 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) by Techtronic Industries Company Limited. (Griffin, Asher)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/25 3:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice DAVID S. KORZENIK. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
24 24 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/24 11:12 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter D. Kennedy for David S. Korzenik ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-20089568) by on behalf of MW Domino Management LLC, Muddy Waters Capital LLC. (Kennedy, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
23 23 21 pgs motion Dismiss Tue 04/22 2:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(6) by MW Domino Management LLC, Muddy Waters Capital LLC. (Kennedy, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/21 8:45 AM
Text Order GRANTING the Unopposed22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants Muddy Waters Capital LLC and MW Domino Management LLC's response to the complaint is due by April 30, 2025. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mmlc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 03/21 9:47 AM
Reset Answer Deadlines: MW Domino Management LLC and Muddy Waters Capital LLC answer due 4/30/2025. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 03/20 2:09 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by MW Domino Management LLC, Muddy Waters Capital LLC. (Kennedy, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
21 21 misc Sealed Document Mon 03/17 9:49 AM
Sealed Complaint filed by Plaintiff (cc3)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Sealed Order on Motion Fri 03/14 10:42 AM
SEALED ORDER GRANTING19 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
19 19 motion Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Thu 03/13 7:32 PM
Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Griffin, Asher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit SEALED DOCUMENT,
Att: 3 Exhibit SEALED DOCUMENT
Thursday, March 06, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/06 2:29 PM
ORDER GRANTING16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to KRISTIN TAHLER. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/06 2:28 PM
ORDER GRANTING15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to LAURA FERGUSON. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/05 3:11 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Asher B. Griffin on behalf of Kristin Tahler ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19872433) by on behalf of Techtronic Industries Company Limited.(Griffin, Asher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/05 1:13 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Asher B. Griffin on behalf of Laura Ferguson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19871280) by on behalf of Techtronic Industries Company Limited.(Griffin, Asher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/04 10:30 AM
ORDER GRANTING12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to NICHOLAS INNS. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/04 10:15 AM
ORDER GRANTING11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JASON STERNBERG. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/04 8:30 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Asher B. Griffin Nicholas Inns ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19860808) by on behalf of Techtronic Industries Company Limited.(Griffin, Asher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 03, 2025
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/03 6:10 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Asher B. Griffin for Jason Sternberg ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19860266) by on behalf of Techtronic Industries Company Limited.(Griffin, Asher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/26 6:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Techtronic Industries Company Limited. MW Domino Management LLC served on 2/21/2025, answer due 3/14/2025. (Griffin, Asher)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/26 6:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Techtronic Industries Company Limited. Muddy Waters Capital LLC served on 2/21/2025, answer due 3/14/2025. (Griffin, Asher)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Fri 02/21 10:16 AM
Summons Issued as to MW Domino Management, LLC. (cc3)
Related: [-]
notice Deficiency Notice Fri 02/21 3:06 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 3 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document The Court requires that the document(s) requested to be sealed be attached to the Motion for the Courts review. Please re-docket your motion using the Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document event from the SEALED EVENTS menu. Attach a Proposed Order and the document(s) to be sealed as an exhibit(s). Parties may not use the Courts electronic notice facilities to serve sealed documents, so your certificate of service must indicate the other service method employed (cc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
7 7 misc JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) Submitted Thu 02/20 5:37 PM
JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Techtronic Industries Company Limited. (Griffin, Asher)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/20 5:17 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Techtronic Industries Company Limited. Corrected (Griffin, Asher)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 02/20 3:46 PM
Summons Issued as to Muddy Waters Capital LLC. Clerk notes the duplicate requested summons was not issued. (kp)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Deficiency Notice Thu 02/20 3:45 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 1 Complaint: The Complaint you filed is deficient because the JS44 is not attached. This form can be located on our website. Please prepare and electronically submit the JS44 using the event located at Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - JS44. This form is required for civil cases filed in the Western District of Texas. (kp)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Thu 02/20 12:34 PM
Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Griffin, Asher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/20 12:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Techtronic Industries Company, Limited. (Griffin, Asher)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/20 12:19 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19816213), filed by Techtronic Industries Company, Limited.(Griffin, Asher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 61 pgs Exhibit 2
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 02/20 3:44 PM
Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Thu 02/20 3:44 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Thu 02/20 3:44 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Techtronic Industries Company Limited. (kp)
Related: [-]