California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:William J Lafferty
Case #: 1:25-bk-10088
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc.
1544 Ludwig Ave
Santa Rosa, CA 95407-7357
Represented By
Michael C. Fallon
Law Offices Of Michael C. Fallon
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SR
Office of the United States Trustee Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102


Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
130 130 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 05/16 10:42 AM
Notice of Hearing to correct docket 127 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/3/2025 at 09:30 AM in/via Oakland Room 220 - Lafferty. Filed by Debtor Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc. (Fallon, Michael)
Related: [-] 112 Motion for Sale of Property Davey Tree Expert Filed by Debtor Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration),120 Objection of Anvil Builders to Motion For Authority to Sell Personal Property [Doc.# 112] (RE: related document(s)112 Motion for Sale of Property). Filed by Creditor Anvil Builders
129 129 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 05/16 10:40 AM
Notice of Hearing to Correct Docket 126 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/3/2025 at 09:30 AM in/via Oakland Room 220 - Lafferty. Filed by Debtor Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc. (Fallon, Michael)
Related: [-] 119 Objection of Anvil Builders to Motion For Authority to Sell Personal Property [Doc.# 110] (RE: related document(s)110 Motion for Sale of Property). Filed by Creditor Anvil Builders
Thursday, May 15, 2025
128 128 notice Notice Thu 05/15 1:50 PM
Notice Regarding Motion for Authoritty to Sell Personal Property Related [+]. Filed by Debtor Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc. (Fallon, Michael)
Related: [-] 95 Motion for Sale of Property (Customer List) Filed by Debtor Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
127 127 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 05/15 11:26 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/3/2025 at 09:30 AM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Filed by Debtor Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc. (Fallon, Michael)
Related: [-] 120 Objection of Anvil Builders to Motion For Authority to Sell Personal Property [Doc.# 112] (RE: related document(s)112 Motion for Sale of Property). Filed by Creditor Anvil Builders
126 126 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 05/15 11:25 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/3/2025 at 09:30 AM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Filed by Debtor Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc. (Fallon, Michael)
Related: [-] 119 Objection of Anvil Builders to Motion For Authority to Sell Personal Property [Doc.# 110] (RE: related document(s)110 Motion for Sale of Property). Filed by Creditor Anvil Builders
125 125 motion Entry of Default Thu 05/15 11:15 AM
Motion for Entry of Default (National) Related [+]. Filed by Debtor Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc. (Fallon, Michael)
Related: [-] 102 Motion for Sale of Property filed by Debtor Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc.,103 Opportunity for Hearing filed by Debtor Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc.
124 124 motion Entry of Default Thu 05/15 11:02 AM
Motion for Entry of Default (Fahy) Related [+]. Filed by Debtor Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc. (Fallon, Michael)
Related: [-] 104 Motion for Sale of Property filed by Debtor Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc.,105 Opportunity for Hearing filed by Debtor Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc.
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
123 123 1 pgs audio audio Wed 05/14 10:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/14/2025 10:30:06 AM ]. File Size [ 2141 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:08:55 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Fri 05/16 9:25 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Minutes of Proceeding: For the reasons stated on the record, the matter is continued to 6/3/2025. Parties discussed schedule of due dates for filings. Hearing continued to 06/03/2025 at 09:30 AM in/via Oakland Room 220 - Lafferty. (rs)
Related: [-] 97 Motion for Sale of Property (Equipment),95 Motion for Sale of Property (Customer List)
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
122 122 misc Status Conference Statement Tue 05/13 3:33 PM
Status Conference Statement for May 14, 2025 Status Conference . Filed by Debtor Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc. (Terry, Philip)
Related: [-]
121 121 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/13 8:28 AM
Corrected Certificate of Service re: Mailing Matrix Related [+]. Filed by Debtor Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc. (Fallon, Michael)
Related: [-] 111 Opportunity for Hearing,113 Opportunity for Hearing
Monday, May 12, 2025
120 120 obj Objection Mon 05/12 4:24 PM
Objection of Anvil Builders to Motion For Authority to Sell Personal Property [Doc.# 112] Related [+]. Filed by Creditor Anvil Builders (Praetzellis, Jack)
Related: [-] 112 Motion for Sale of Property
119 119 obj Objection Mon 05/12 4:23 PM
Objection of Anvil Builders to Motion For Authority to Sell Personal Property [Doc.# 110] Related [+]. Filed by Creditor Anvil Builders (Praetzellis, Jack)
Related: [-] 110 Motion for Sale of Property
118 118 1 pgs notice Notice of Hearing Mon 05/12 8:44 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/14/2025 at 10:30 AM in/via Oakland Room 220 - Lafferty. Filed by Debtor Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc. (Fallon, Michael)
Related: [-] 95 Motion for Sale of Property (Customer List) Filed by Debtor Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration),97 Motion for Sale of Property (Equipment) Filed by Debtor Kingsborough Atlas Tree Surgery Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration),114 Objection of Anvil Builders to Motion For Sale of Property (Customer List) [Docket No. 95] (RE: related document(s)95 Motion for Sale of Property). Filed by Creditor Anvil Builders,116 Objection of Anvil Builders to Motion For Authority to Sell Personal Property [Docket No. 97} (RE: related document(s)97 Motion for Sale of Property). Filed by Creditor Anvil Builders
Friday, May 09, 2025
117 117 misc Substitution of Attorney Fri 05/09 10:44 AM
Substitution of Attorney . Attorney Jay K Chien terminated. Paul G. Leahy added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee / SR (Leahy, Paul)
Related: [-]