Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:William C Griesbach
Case #: 1:25-cv-00252
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 5:43 AM CDT
Defendant
CH Robinson Company Inc
Represented By
Matthew C Koch
Marwedel Minichello & Reeb PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Schneider Logistics Inc
Represented By
David D Leishman
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Michael R Phillips
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
15 15 order Text Only Order Tue 05/06 11:38 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER directing Defendant C.H. Robinson Company, Inc. to notify the court by May 14, 2025, whether the pending10 motion to dismiss is moot based on Plaintiff Schneider Logistics, Inc.'s14 amended complaint, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 5/6/2025. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/05 4:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CH Robinson Company Inc filed by Schneider Logistics Inc.(Leishman, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Master Brokerage Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Transportation Schedule,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Demand Letter to CH Robinson 9.16.24,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-CHR Claim Response
Friday, April 18, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion to File Fri 04/18 10:03 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint, signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 04/18/2025. Plaintiff shall file its amended complaint on or before May 5, 2025. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time File Thu 04/17 12:55 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Amended Complaint , MOTION to File by Schneider Logistics Inc. (Leishman, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
11 11 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 04/10 2:14 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by CH Robinson Company Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Koch, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
10 10 motion Dismiss Mon 03/31 5:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by CH Robinson Company Inc. (Koch, Matthew)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss Mon 03/31 4:59 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Count II and Count III of the Plaintiff's Complaint by CH Robinson Company Inc. (Koch, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 03/27 2:22 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by CH Robinson Company Inc. (Koch, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 03/27 11:53 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Schneider Logistics Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Leishman, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 03/27 10:56 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Schneider Logistics Inc. (Leishman, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Wed 03/26 1:25 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by District Judge Byron B Conway on 3/26/2025. District Judge Byron B Conway recused. Case reassigned to Judge William C Griesbach for all further proceedings. (cc: all counsel) (Conway, Byron)
Related: [-]
notice Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate Wed 03/26 3:31 PM
NOTICE from the clerk to Plaintiff and Defendant requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available[LINK:here] . In addition, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (mav)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
4 4 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 03/19 3:41 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by District Judge Byron B. Conway on 3/19/2025: The defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time (ECF No.3 ) is GRANTED. The defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint shall be extended to March 31, 2025. (cc: all counsel) (Conway, Byron)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
3 3 motion Extension of Time Fri 03/14 3:20 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by CH Robinson Company Inc. (Koch, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/14 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C Koch on behalf of CH Robinson Company Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew C. Koch (Koch, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
service Summons Issued Fri 02/21 10:45 AM
Summons Issued as to CH Robinson Company Inc. (jmk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/20 2:51 PM
COMPLAINT against CH Robinson Company Inc by Schneider Logistics Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4888264)(Leishman, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exh A Robinson MBA,
Att: 2 Exh B SLI_ CHR_ Chevron Transportation Schedule2,
Att: 3 Exh C Schneider Demand Letter,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 02/20 2:54 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to District Judge Byron B Conway; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
Related: [-]